EP1900323 - Medical electrode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leonh. Lang Archenweg 56 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [2009/51] |
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states Leonh, Lang Archenweg 56 6020 Innsbruck / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fürtinger, Christian Lehmweg 24 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | Torggler, Paul Norbert, et al Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Torggler, Paul Norbert, et al Patentanwälte Torggler & Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 Postfach 556 6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 07017727.4 | 11.09.2007 | [2008/12] | Priority number, date | AT20060001542 | 15.09.2006 Original published format: AT 15422006 | [2008/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1900323 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1900323 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0408 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
A61N1/048 (EP,US);
A61B5/257 (US);
A61B5/25 (EP);
A61B5/266 (US);
A61N1/0492 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/12] | Title | German: | Medizinische Elektrode | [2008/12] | English: | Medical electrode | [2008/12] | French: | Electrode médicale | [2008/12] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 11.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.01.2010 | CZ | 06.01.2010 | DK | 06.01.2010 | EE | 06.01.2010 | FI | 06.01.2010 | IE | 06.01.2010 | IT | 06.01.2010 | LT | 06.01.2010 | LV | 06.01.2010 | MT | 06.01.2010 | NL | 06.01.2010 | PL | 06.01.2010 | RO | 06.01.2010 | SE | 06.01.2010 | SI | 06.01.2010 | SK | 06.01.2010 | TR | 06.01.2010 | BG | 06.04.2010 | GR | 07.04.2010 | ES | 17.04.2010 | IS | 06.05.2010 | PT | 06.05.2010 | HU | 07.07.2010 | LU | 11.09.2010 | BE | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
IT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
MT | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
HU | 07.07.2010 | ||
LU | 11.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
IT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
MT | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
HU | 07.07.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
IT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
MT | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
IT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
IT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | FI | 06.01.2010 | |
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | SI | 06.01.2010 | |
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | SI | 06.01.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3989035 (ZUEHLSDORFF WERNER G) [X] 1,4 * figure 4 *; | [X]US4522211 (BARE REX O [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0635239 (LANG LEONHARD [AT]) [Y] 2 * column 3, lines 51-53 * * column 4, lines 9-11 * * figure 1 *; | [XY]US5632274 (QUEDENS PHILLIPP J [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * figure 8 * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]WO2006046160 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 3* page 6, lines 30,31 * |