EP1927780 - Compressed air brake cylinder with piston arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WABCO GmbH Postfach 91 12 62 30432 Hannover / DE | [2008/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ewald, Jürgen Lange Weihe 87 30880 Laatzen / DE | 02 /
Matthias, Wilfried Martin-Luther-Strasse 48 31542 Bad Nenndorf / DE | 03 /
Schrader, Frank Seerosenstrasse 12 30916 Isernhagen / DE | [2008/23] | Representative(s) | Günther, Constantin WABCO GmbH Postfach 91 12 62 30432 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Günther, Constantin WABCO GmbH Postfach 91 12 62 30432 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2008/23] | Günther, Constantin WABCO GmbH Postfach 91 12 62 30432 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 07017822.3 | 12.09.2007 | [2008/23] | Priority number, date | DE20061056710 | 30.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006056710 | [2008/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1927780 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1927780 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | [2009/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1927780 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/32 | [2008/23] | CPC: |
F16D65/28 (EP);
B60T17/081 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2009/49] |
Former [2008/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Druckluftbremszylinder in Kolbenbauweise | [2008/23] | English: | Compressed air brake cylinder with piston arrangement | [2008/23] | French: | Cylindre à air comprimé avec arrangement de piston | [2008/23] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/45] | 26.09.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 30.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]DE102005001234 (WABCO GMBH & CO OHG [DE]) [DX] 1,5,8,10-12 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0949433 (WABCO PERROT BREMSEN GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * |