EP1862911 - Interface device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/49] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bando, Hideaki Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [2007/49] | Representative(s) | Keston, Susan Elizabeth, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/49] | Keston, Susan Elizabeth, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07017849.6 | 27.06.2002 | [2007/49] | Priority number, date | JP20010225052 | 25.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001225052 | [2007/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1862911 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1862911 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40, H04L29/08, H03K19/00 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
G06K19/077 (EP,US);
G06F13/00 (KR);
G06F13/4072 (EP,US);
G06F13/4081 (EP,US);
G06F13/4291 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/49] | Title | German: | Schnittstellenvorrichtung | [2007/49] | English: | Interface device | [2007/49] | French: | Dispositif d'interface | [2007/49] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 19.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02738823.0 / EP1411705 | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5086427 (WHITTAKER BRUCE E [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9949415 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]US5966723 (JAMES DAVID B [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8 * the whole document *; | [PX]US2001009505 (NISHIZAWA HIROTAKA [JP], et al) [PX] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [PA]US2001044870 (FISHER ROLLIE M [US], et al) [PA] 1-8* the whole document * | by applicant | US5966723 |