blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2036556

EP2036556 - Piperidone derivatives and medical uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.02.2010
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.02.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.03.2010  [2010/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Heinrich-Pette-Institut
Martinistrasse 52
20251 Hamburg / DE
For all designated states
Julius-Maximilians-Universität Würzburg
Sanderring 2
97970 Würzburg / DE
[2009/12]
Inventor(s)01 / Hauber, Joachim, Prof. Dr.
Högenstrasse 65
22527 Hamburg / DE
02 / Hauber, Ilona
Högenstrasse 65
22527 Hamburg / DE
03 / Holzgrabe, Ulrike, Prof. Dr.
Lerchenberg 35A
97246 Eibelstadt / DE
04 / Klöckner, Jessica
Abtsleitenweg 10
97074 Würzburg / DE
 [2009/12]
Representative(s)Weber, Martin, et al
Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/12]Weber, Martin, et al
Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date07017891.812.09.2007
[2009/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2036556
Date:18.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.2007
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/451, A61K31/4523, A61K31/4545, A61P31/12, A61P31/18, A61P33/02, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, C07D211/44
[2009/12]
CPC:
A61K31/451 (EP); A61K31/4523 (EP); A61K31/4545 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP); A61P31/18 (EP); A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP); A61P35/02 (EP); C07D211/74 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2009/48]
Former [2009/12]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Piperidonderivate und deren medizinische Verwendungen[2009/12]
English:Piperidone derivatives and medical uses thereof[2009/12]
French:Dérivés de pipéridone et leurs utilisations médicales[2009/12]
Examination procedure19.09.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/12]
29.10.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/12]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200903   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]  - MERZ, KURT WALTHER ET AL, "Desmotropy of piperidinonedicarboxylic acid esters", CHEMISCHE BERICHTE , 98(7), 2317-21 CODEN: CHBEAM; ISSN: 0009-2940, (1965), XP002458324 [X] 1,3,5-8 * the whole document, in particular compounds I, IIa, IIIa and IV of table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cber.19650980734
 [X]  - RAM, VISHNU JI ET AL, "Piperidones as potential anticancer agents", JOURNAL OF THE INDIAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY , 51(10), 878-9 CODEN: JICSAH; ISSN: 0019-4522, (1974), XP009091968 [X] 1,3,5,6,11-13,20,22-24 * the whole document, in particular compounds 2, 5, of table 1 and compounds 1-4 of table 2 *
 [X]  - BHARGAVA, P. N. ET AL, "2,6-Diaryl-3-ethoxycarhonyl-4-piperidones and their N-methyl derivatives", J. INDIAN CHEM. SOC. , 35, 814-16, (1958), XP009092003 [X] 1-4,6,22 * page 815; tables I,and,III *
 [X]  - ZHELYAZKOV, L. ET AL, "Synthesis and pharmacological study of some structural analogs of Tempidone", TRUDOVE NA NAUCHNOIZSLEDOVATELSKIYA KHIMIKOFARMATSEVTICHEN INSTITUT , 8, 13-27 CODEN: TKZGAG; ISSN: 0371-8972, (1972), XP009092022 [X] 1-3,5,6,11,22 * page 14, paragraph 2 * * page 15 * * page 16, compounds 9-17 * * page 18; table 2 *
 [X]  - SIENER T ET AL, "Synthesis and Opioid Receptor Affinity of a Series of 2,4-Diaryl- Substituted 3,7-Diazabicyclononanones", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (20000913), vol. 43, no. 20, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 3746 - 3751, XP002400783 [X] 22 * page 3749, column 2, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm0009484
 [DX]  - MICHAEL SAEFTEL ET AL, "Piperidones with activity against Plasmodium falciparum", PARASITOLOGY RESEARCH ; FOUNDED AS ZEITSCHRIFT FÜR PARASITENKUNDE, SPRINGER-VERLAG, BE, (20060321), vol. 99, no. 3, ISSN 1432-1955, pages 281 - 286, XP019427964 [DX] 22 * page 283, column 1, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00436-006-0173-4
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.