EP1930091 - Suction device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TBH GmbH Heinrich-Hertz-Strasse 8 75334 Straubenhardt / DE | [2008/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hartmann, Udo Schwarzwaldstrasse 20 75305 Neuenbürg / DE | [2008/24] | Representative(s) | Durm, Frank, et al Durm & Partner Patentanwälte Moltkestrasse 45 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | [2008/24] | Application number, filing date | 07018567.3 | 21.09.2007 | [2008/24] | Priority number, date | DE20062018457U | 06.12.2006 Original published format: DE 202006018457 U | [2008/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1930091 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1930091 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B08B5/04, B08B13/00, B01D46/00 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
B08B5/04 (EP);
B01D46/0091 (EP);
B08B13/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/24] | Title | German: | Absauggerät | [2008/24] | English: | Suction device | [2008/24] | French: | Appareil d'aspiration | [2008/24] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 16.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.12.2010 | CZ | 29.12.2010 | DK | 29.12.2010 | EE | 29.12.2010 | FI | 29.12.2010 | HU | 29.12.2010 | IE | 29.12.2010 | LT | 29.12.2010 | LV | 29.12.2010 | MT | 29.12.2010 | NL | 29.12.2010 | PL | 29.12.2010 | RO | 29.12.2010 | SE | 29.12.2010 | SI | 29.12.2010 | SK | 29.12.2010 | TR | 29.12.2010 | BG | 29.03.2011 | GR | 30.03.2011 | IS | 29.04.2011 | PT | 29.04.2011 | LU | 21.09.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
IE | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
MT | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
TR | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
LU | 21.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
IE | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
MT | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
LU | 21.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
IE | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
MT | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
IE | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 29.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4450964 (WOOD JOSEPH A [US]) [A] 1-6 * figures 3,8,10 *; | [A]US5837040 (CAUGHRON JAMES S [US], et al) [A] 1-6* abstract *; | [XP]US2007214961 (RYAN RAYMOND F [US], et al) [XP] 1 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016]; figures 1,2,4 * |