EP1906057 - Method and apparatus to transfer heat to automatic transmission fluid using engine exhaust gas feed stream [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.01.2014 [2014/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GM Global Technology Operations LLC 300 Renaissance Center Detroit, MI 48265-3000 / US | [2011/30] |
Former [2008/14] | For all designated states GM Global Technology Operations, Inc. 300 Renaissance Center Detroit, MI 48265-3000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Samie, Farzad 30720 Cheviot Hills Drive Franklin Michigan 48025 / US | 02 /
Carlson, Richard W. 3641 Terrance Ferry Drive Joliet Illinois 60431 / US | 03 /
Robertson, Thomas A. Jr. 356 N. Main Romeo Michigan 48065 / US | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/04] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/14] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07018593.9 | 21.09.2007 | [2008/14] | Priority number, date | US20060827082P | 27.09.2006 Original published format: US 827082 P | US20070856229 | 17.09.2007 Original published format: US 856229 | [2008/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1906057 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1906057 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1906057 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/04 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
F16H57/0413 (EP,US);
F01N5/02 (EP,US);
F02M26/28 (EP,US);
F16H57/0415 (EP,US);
F01N2240/02 (EP,US);
F01N2410/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE [2011/36] |
Former [2008/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Übertragung von Wärme zum Automatikgetriebeöl unter Verwendung des Zufuhrstroms der Motorabgase | [2008/14] | English: | Method and apparatus to transfer heat to automatic transmission fluid using engine exhaust gas feed stream | [2008/14] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour transférer la chaleur vers un fluide de transmission automatique utilisant un flux d'alimentation de gaz d'échappement de moteur | [2008/14] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 06.07.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.08.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JPH10318348 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,2,4,6-8 * figure 5 * [Y] 5,10 [I] 3,9; | [Y]JP2005099592 (SHARP KK) [Y] 5,10* figure 1 *; | [XYI]US2005202933 (SORAB JAGADISH [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-8 * abstract * [Y] 5,10 [I] 3,9 | Examination | JP2005299592 |