EP1906307 - Computer-implemented clipboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accenture Global Services Limited 3 Grand Canal Plaza Grand Canal Street Upper Dublin 4 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states Accenture Global Services Limited 3 Grand Canal Plaza Grand Canal Street Upper Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2008/14] | For all designated states Accenture Global Services GmbH Herrenacker 15 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beumer, Bradley R. 2031 W. Mc. Lean Avenue Chicago, IL 60647 / US | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07018635.8 | 21.09.2007 | [2008/14] | Priority number, date | US20060537581 | 29.09.2006 Original published format: US 537581 | [2008/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1906307 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
G06F9/543 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/14] | Title | German: | Computerimplementierte Zwischenablage | [2008/14] | English: | Computer-implemented clipboard | [2008/14] | French: | Tablette à mise en oeuvre informatique | [2008/14] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 06.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/10] | 27.09.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.10.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0785507 (CANON INFORMATION SYST INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * column 5 - column 11 *; | [A]EP0886413 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1-20 * column 4 - column 10 *; | [A]EP1452966 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0013] *; | [A]US2005102629 (CHEN YEN-FU [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0086] *; | [A]US2005203935 (MCARDLE JAMES M [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0041] *; | [X] - STONE D, "The Office Clipboard", PC MAGAZINE, (200112), pages 1 - 2, XP002461637 [X] 1-20 * page 1 - page 2 * | [A] - "CLIPBOARD MECHANISM FOR EXCHANGING ATTRIBUTES", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19951001), vol. 38, no. 10, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 21 - 22, XP000540399 [A] 1-20 * page 1 - page 2 * | [A] - "APPEND FEATURE FOR CLIPBOARDS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19930601), vol. 36, no. 6B, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 271 - 272, XP000377379 [A] 1-20 * page 1 * | Examination | US2005154994 | by applicant | US2005154994 | US2005203935 |