Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] |
30.04.2010 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
16.03.2010 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
06.11.2009 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
06.11.2009 | Definitive list of designations | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] |
06.11.2009 | First examination report | |
30.10.2009 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
23.10.2009 | Request for examination filed | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] |
27.02.2009 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] |