EP2042208 - Dispensing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim / DE | [2009/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wachtel, Herbert Im Muehlengarten 4 55218 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 02 /
Richter, Frank Fichtenweg 3 55218 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2009/14] | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/14] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07018787.7 | 25.09.2007 | [2009/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2042208 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
A61M15/0028 (EP,US);
A61M11/001 (EP,US);
A61M15/0026 (EP,US);
A61M15/0035 (EP,US);
A61M15/0045 (EP,US);
A61M15/0048 (EP,US);
A61M15/0061 (EP,US);
A61M2202/064 (EP,US);
A61M2205/8218 (EP,US);
A61M2206/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2009/50] |
Former [2009/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Abgabevorrichtung | [2009/14] | English: | Dispensing device | [2009/14] | French: | Dispositif distributeur | [2009/14] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/14] | 09.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6158676 (HUGHES NATHANIEL [US]) [A] 1-11* column 5, line 40 - line 46 *; | [X]WO2005002654 (MERIDICA LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,11 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figures 1,7,9 * * figures 3b,9a,9b * * page 5, line 11 - line 20 *; | [A]US2005087189 (CROCKFORD DAVID R [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0053] *; | [XY]WO2006037636 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM MICROPART [DE], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0126] * * figures 2,16,18-20 * * figures 3,17 * [Y] 10,11; | [XY]EP1795221 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [DE]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0093] * * figures 1,4,6,9,11 * [Y] 10,11 |