Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.04.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
12.04.2013 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | |
13.11.2012 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | |
21.09.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.04.2012 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | |
30.09.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.09.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.10.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.05.2009 | Definitive list of designations | published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] |
28.04.2009 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
19.12.2008 | First examination report | |
12.12.2008 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
29.08.2008 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] |
29.08.2008 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] |