EP1974796 - Mixed particles and honeycomb structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ibiden Co., Ltd. 1, Kandacho 2-chome Ogaki-shi, Gifu 503-8604 / JP | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohno, Kazushige Ibiden Co., Ltd. Ogakikita Kojo 1-1, Kitagata Ibigawa-cho Ibi-Gun, Gifu 501-0695 / JP | 02 /
Ido, Takahiko Ibiden Co., Ltd. Ogakikita Kojo 1-1, Kitagata Ibigawa-cho Ibi-Gun, Gifu 501-0695 / JP | 03 /
Koga, Yoshihiro Ibiden Co., Ltd. Ogakikita Kojo 1-1, Kitagata Ibigawa-cho Ibi-Gun, Gifu 501-0695 / JP | 04 /
Akema, Yuji Ibiden Co., Ltd. Ogakikita Kojo 1-1, Kitagata Ibigawa-cho Ibi-Gun, Gifu 501-0695 / JP | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07018914.7 | 26.09.2007 | [2008/40] | Priority number, date | WO2007JP57257 | 30.03.2007 Original published format: PCT/JP2007/057257 | [2008/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1974796 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/94, B01J23/40, B01J23/42, B01J35/00, B01J35/04, B01J37/02, B01J37/04 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
B01J23/40 (EP,US);
B01J23/42 (EP,US);
B01J23/63 (EP,US);
B01J35/19 (EP,US);
B01J35/40 (EP,US);
B01J37/04 (EP,US);
C04B35/101 (EP,US);
C04B35/117 (EP,US);
C04B35/50 (EP,US);
C04B35/80 (EP,US);
C04B38/0006 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1021 (EP,US);
B01D2255/206 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2092 (EP,US);
B01D2255/9202 (EP,US);
B01D2255/9207 (EP,US);
B01J35/392 (EP,US);
B01J35/45 (EP);
B01J37/0045 (EP,US);
B01J37/0201 (EP,US);
B01J37/16 (EP,US);
C04B2111/0081 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3224 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3227 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3229 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3232 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3244 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3418 (EP,US);
C04B2235/408 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0006, C04B35/10, C04B35/50, C04B35/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/40] | Title | German: | Gemischte Partikel- und Wabenstruktur | [2008/40] | English: | Mixed particles and honeycomb structure | [2008/40] | French: | Particules mélangées et structure en nid d'abeille | [2008/40] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2007 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 17.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.12.2012 | 20.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/21] | 30.11.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/21] | 11.12.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0558159 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]); | [X]US6261989 (TANAKA HIROHISA [JP], et al); | [X]EP1121979 (FORD GLOBAL TECH INC [US]); | [X]EP1174174 (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [X]WO2006016633 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2006025613 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) | Examination | JP2006224086 |