EP1881637 - Priority-handling for data transmissions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Löhr, Joachim c/oPanasonic R & D Center Germany GmbH Monzastrasse 4c 63225 Langen / DE | 02 /
Seidel, Eiko c/oPanasonic R & D Center Germany GmbH Monzastrasse 4c 63225 Langen / DE | 03 /
Petrovic, Dragan c/o Panasonic R & D Center Germany GmbH Monzastrasse 4c 63225 Langen / DE | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07019152.3 | 15.06.2004 | [2008/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1881637 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1881637 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04L12/56 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
H04L1/1812 (EP,US);
H04W72/12 (KR);
H04W72/566 (EP,US);
H04L1/1887 (EP,US);
H04L65/00 (KR);
H04L65/40 (KR);
H04W72/56 (KR);
H04W72/1268 (EP,US);
H04W74/00 (EP,US);
H04W84/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/04] | Title | German: | Prioritätsbehandlung für Datenübertragungen | [2008/04] | English: | Priority-handling for data transmissions | [2008/04] | French: | Manipulation prioritaire pour transmissions de données | [2008/04] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 23.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04014004.8 / EP1608194 | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.01.2011 | BE | 05.01.2011 | CY | 05.01.2011 | CZ | 05.01.2011 | DK | 05.01.2011 | EE | 05.01.2011 | HU | 05.01.2011 | IT | 05.01.2011 | NL | 05.01.2011 | PL | 05.01.2011 | RO | 05.01.2011 | SI | 05.01.2011 | SK | 05.01.2011 | TR | 05.01.2011 | BG | 05.04.2011 | GR | 06.04.2011 | ES | 16.04.2011 | PT | 05.05.2011 | IE | 15.06.2011 | LU | 15.06.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
TR | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LU | 15.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LU | 15.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 05.01.2011 | |
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | SI | 05.01.2011 | |
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | SI | 05.01.2011 | |
ES | 16.04.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002085531 (HERRMANN CHRISTOPH [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0053] *; | [X]US2002122400 (VAYANOS ALKINOOS [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0130] *; | [X]US6463071 (ARAUJO KENNETH [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 4, line 20 - line 63 * * column 7, line 45 - line 67 * * column 8, line 65 - column 10, line 23 *; | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Radio Interface Protocol Architecture (3G TS 25.301 version 3.3.0)", 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION GROUP RADIO ACCESS NETWORK; RADIO INTERFACE PROTOCOL ARCHITECTURE (3G TS 25.301 VERSION 3.3.0), XX, XX, (199912), XP002164238 | by applicant | IS88023 | US2002085531 | US2002122400 | US6463071 |