EP1876703 - Modulator with low sensitivity to amplitude and phase errors of the carrier signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2010/52] |
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121-1714 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sahota, Kamal Gurkanwal 3560 Curlet St. San Diego CA 92103 / US | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstraße 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07019275.2 | 03.11.2000 | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1876703 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1876703 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | [2008/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1876703 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/36, H03B27/00 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
H03C3/40 (EP);
H04L27/34 (KR);
H03D7/1433 (EP);
H03D7/1441 (EP);
H03D7/1458 (EP);
H03D7/165 (EP);
H03D7/166 (EP);
H04L27/206 (EP);
H04L27/22 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2008/02] | H03B27/00, H04L27/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2008/02] | Title | German: | Modulator mit geringer Anfälligkeit für Amplituden- und Phasenfehler des Trägersignals | [2008/02] | English: | Modulator with low sensitivity to amplitude and phase errors of the carrier signal | [2008/02] | French: | Modulateur avec faible densité pour les erreurs de phase et d'amplitude d'un signal de porteur | [2008/02] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 09.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 28.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 07.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00976923.3 / EP1330905 | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/49] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.10.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 07.10.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.10.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.12.2010 | BE | 29.12.2010 | CY | 29.12.2010 | DK | 29.12.2010 | FI | 29.12.2010 | IT | 29.12.2010 | NL | 29.12.2010 | SE | 29.12.2010 | TR | 29.12.2010 | GR | 30.03.2011 | ES | 09.04.2011 | PT | 29.04.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2012/24] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
IT | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5111155 (KEATE CHRISTOPHER R [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * column 5, line 31 - column 6, line 11 * * figures 4,5 * [A] 12,13; | [A]US5412351 (NYSTROM CHRISTIAN [US], et al) [A] 1,3-7,12 * abstract * * column 5, line 23 - column 6, line 55 * * column 10, line 32 - line 48 * * figures 8,9 *; | [X]US5438301 (HAVENS JOSEPH H [US], et al) [X] 1-11,13 * abstract * * column 2, line 30 - column 5, line 28 * * figures 1-3 *; | [XA]US5705958 (JANER PATRICK [FR]) [X] 1-11,13 * column 6, line 22 - line 48 * * column 7, line 12 - line 38 * * figures 6,9 * [A] 12; | [E]DE19934215 (ROHDE & SCHWARZ [DE]) [E] 1,4,8,9 * column 2, line 47 - line 52 ** figure 3 * | by applicant | US5111155 | US5412351 | US5438301 | US5705958 |