EP1909229 - Tracking device and image-capturing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | ||
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muramatsu, Keiko Nikon Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | [2014/08] |
Former [2008/15] | 01 /
Muramatsu, Keiko Nikon Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/08] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/15] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07019333.9 | 02.10.2007 | [2008/15] | Priority number, date | JP20060271614 | 03.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006271614 | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1909229 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1909229 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | [2009/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1909229 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/20, H04N5/232 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
G03B35/18 (EP,US);
G06T7/20 (EP,US);
H04N23/61 (EP,US);
H04N23/611 (EP,US);
H04N23/635 (EP,US);
H04N23/64 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/15] | G06T7/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/10] |
Former [2008/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfolgungsvorrichtung und Bildaufnahmegerät | [2008/15] | English: | Tracking device and image-capturing apparatus | [2008/15] | French: | Dispositif de suivi et appareil de capture d'image | [2008/15] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 07.01.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003090751 (ITOKAWA OSAMU [JP], et al) [X] 1,16,18 * page 1 - page 2 * * page 3 - page 4 * * page 8 - page 12 * * figures 15,17,19,20,23 *; | [X]US2004004670 (YAMASHITA YUICHIRO [US]) [X] 1-21 * page 1 - page 4; figures 1-10 *; | [A]US2004017502 (ALDERSON TIMOTHY [US]) [A] 2,3 * page 1, paragraph 14 *; | [A]EP1560425 (FUJINON CORP [JP]) [A] 12-15 * page 6 - page 10; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2006193495 (KUROKAWA NATSUKI [JP]) [A] 12-15* page 4 - page 5 * | by applicant | US2004004670 | JP2006058431 |