EP1890309 - Keyboards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Purcocks, Dale McPhee 1/2 Brookfield Terrace Blackrock Dublin / IE | [2008/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | Davies, Gregory Mark Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Davies, Gregory Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | ||
Former [2008/47] | Strachan, Victoria Jane VJS Intellectual Property Services 134 St. Tello Street Pontarddulais Swansea SA4 8RE / GB | ||
Former [2008/08] | Strachan, Victoria Jane Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07019616.7 | 06.12.2004 | [2010/08] | Priority number, date | GB20030029985 | 24.12.2003 Original published format: GB 0329985 | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1890309 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1890309 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/70, G06F3/02, H01H13/06 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
H01H13/85 (EP,US);
G06F3/0202 (EP,US);
H01H2215/012 (EP,US);
H01H2223/002 (EP,US);
H01H2223/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Title | German: | Tastaturen | [2008/08] | English: | Keyboards | [2008/08] | French: | Claviers | [2008/08] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 04.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04801327.0 / EP1697952 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   23.06.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.02.2010 | BE | 24.02.2010 | CY | 24.02.2010 | CZ | 24.02.2010 | DK | 24.02.2010 | EE | 24.02.2010 | FI | 24.02.2010 | IT | 24.02.2010 | LT | 24.02.2010 | NL | 24.02.2010 | PL | 24.02.2010 | RO | 24.02.2010 | SE | 24.02.2010 | SI | 24.02.2010 | SK | 24.02.2010 | TR | 24.02.2010 | BG | 24.05.2010 | GR | 25.05.2010 | ES | 04.06.2010 | IS | 24.06.2010 | PT | 25.06.2010 | HU | 25.08.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
HU | 25.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8334679U (SIEMENS AG, 1000 BERLIN UND 8000 MUENCHEN, DE) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [A]DE3241159 (SCHLEGEL GEORG FA [DE]) [A] 10 * page 8, line 3 - line 15; figure - *; | [DA]US4705925 (VERMEULEN RONNY [BE]) [DA] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US5939690 (YASUI TOYOKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 10 * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 19; figures 1,2,5 *; | [X]WO03097322 (PURCOCKS DALE MCPHEE [IE]) [X] 1,2,8,9,11,12 * page 32, paragraph 4 - page 34, paragraph 1; figures 31-37 * |