EP1870044 - ROTATIONAL ATHERECTOMY SYSTEM WITH SERRATED CUTTING TIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/52] | Rotational atherectomy system with serrated cutting tip | ||
[2009/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.07.2010 [2010/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ev3 Endovascular, Inc. 9600 54th Avenue North Plymouth, MN 55442 / US | [2007/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Honeycutt, John S. 1625 Winterwarm Road Fallbrook CA 92028 / US | 02 /
Taylor, Paul 14609 Colony Way Poway CA 92064 / US | 03 /
Heitzmann, Harold A. 18 Ponte Irvine CA 92606 / US | [2007/52] | Representative(s) | Albutt, Anthony John, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/52] | Albutt, Anthony John, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07019617.5 | 26.01.2000 | [2007/52] | Priority number, date | US19990260199 | 01.03.1999 Original published format: US 260199 | US19990398241 | 17.09.1999 Original published format: US 398241 | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1870044 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1870044 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | [2008/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1870044 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] |
Former [2008/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | |
No.: | EP1870044 | ||
Date: | |||
Status: | (deleted) | ||
[2008/13] | |||
[2008/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/22 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
A61B17/320758 (EP);
A61B2017/00022 (EP);
A61B2017/00685 (EP);
A61B2017/22052 (EP);
A61B2017/320004 (EP);
A61B2017/320008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2007/52] | Title | German: | ROTIERENDE ATHEREKTOMIEVORRICHTUNG MIT GEZAHNTER SCHNEIDESPITZE | [2008/04] | English: | ROTATIONAL ATHERECTOMY SYSTEM WITH SERRATED CUTTING TIP | [2009/13] | French: | SYSTEME D'ATHERECTOMIE ROTATIF A POINTE COUPANTE DENTEE | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/52] | Rotierende Atherektomievorrichtung mit gezahnter Schneidespitze | ||
Former [2007/52] | Rotational atherectomy system with serrated cutting tip | ||
Former [2007/52] | Système d'athérectomie rotatif à pointe coupante dentée | Examination procedure | 26.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 04.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00905773.8 / EP1158910 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4020847 (CLARK III WILLIAM T) [A] 1,13 * column 2, line 8 - line 10; figure 3 *; | [A]US4030503 (CLARK III WILLIAM T) [A] 1,13 * column 1, line 56 - line 60; figures 5,7 *; | [Y]US4729763 (HENRIE RODNEY A [US]) [Y] 1-16 * column 3, line 25 - line 33; figure 4 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 55; figure 1 *; | [A]US4850957 (SUMMERS DAVID P [US]) [A] 1,13 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0373927 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [Y] 1-16 * column 4, line 27 - line 53; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0448859 (SHIBER SAMUEL [US]) [A] 1,13 * column 4, line 23 - line 47 * * column 5, line 42 - line 53; figures 2-4 *; | [A]EP0657140 (FISCHELL ROBERT [US]) [A] 1,13 * column 7, line 47 - column 8, line 30; figure 8 *; | [A]WO9804199 (KENSEY NASH CORP [US]) [A] 1,13* figure 3 * | by applicant | EP0073927 | US4990134 | US5092873 | US5314438 |