EP2048081 - Automated dispenser for radiopharmaceuticals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institute of Nuclear Energy Research Atomic Energy Council, Executive Yuan No. 1000, Wunhua Road Jiaan Village Longtan Township Taoyuan County 32546 / TW | [2009/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Ming-Hsin Institute of Nuclear Energy Research Atomic Energy Council Executive Yuan No. 1000, Wunhua Rd. Jiaan Village Longtan Township Taoyuan County 32546 / TW | 02 /
Lin, Wuu-Jyh Institute of Nuclear Energy Research Atomic Energy Counci Executive Yuan No. 1000, Wunhua Rd. Jiaan Village Longtan Township Taoyuan County 32546 / TW | 03 /
Zen, Tain-Shi Institute of Nuclear Energy Research Atomic Energy Council Executive Yuan No. 1000, Wunhua Rd. Jiaan Village Longtan Township Taoyuan County 32546 / TW | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | Hager, Thomas Johannes Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | Hager, Thomas Johannes Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07019673.8 | 08.10.2007 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2048081 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2048081 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65B3/00, // A61J3/00 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
B65B3/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI [2009/52] |
Former [2009/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Automatische Abgabevorrichtung für Radiopharmazeutika | [2009/16] | English: | Automated dispenser for radiopharmaceuticals | [2009/16] | French: | Distributeur automatique pour radio-pharmaceutiques | [2009/16] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2008 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 06.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005278066 (GRAVES KEVIN [US], et al) [A] 1-10; | [A]US2005279419 (TRIBBLE DENNIS [US], et al)[A] 1-10; | [A]US2006151048 (TOCHON-DANGUY HENRI-JACQUES [AU], et al) [A] 1-10 |