EP1916156 - Embarking/disembarking device for a public transport vehicle with a retractable step fitted in a frame [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebr. Bode GmbH & Co. KG Ochshäuser Strasse 14 34123 Kassel / DE | [2008/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rasekhi Coochesfahani, Abbas Lilienweg 9c 34128 Kassel / DE | [2008/18] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstrasse 87 50968 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/18] | Bauer Vorberg Kayser Patentanwälte Lindenallee 43 50968 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 07020100.9 | 13.10.2007 | [2008/18] | Priority number, date | DE20062016432U | 26.10.2006 Original published format: DE 202006016432 U | [2008/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1916156 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1916156 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | [2008/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1916156 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60R3/02, B61D23/02 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
B60R3/02 (EP);
B61D23/025 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/18] | B60R3/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/18] | Title | German: | Ein-Ausstiegsvorrichtung für ein Fahrzeug des öffentlichen Personenverkehrs mit einem Rahmen angeordneten Schiebetritt | [2008/18] | English: | Embarking/disembarking device for a public transport vehicle with a retractable step fitted in a frame | [2008/18] | French: | Dispositif d'entrée et de sortie pour un véhicule de transport en commun doté d'une marche coulissante agencée à l'aide d'un cadre | [2008/18] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 02.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.12.2009 | DK | 16.12.2009 | EE | 16.12.2009 | FI | 16.12.2009 | IE | 16.12.2009 | LT | 16.12.2009 | LV | 16.12.2009 | MT | 16.12.2009 | RO | 16.12.2009 | SE | 16.12.2009 | SI | 16.12.2009 | SK | 16.12.2009 | BG | 16.03.2010 | GR | 17.03.2010 | IS | 16.04.2010 | PT | 16.04.2010 | HU | 17.06.2010 | [2015/22] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 16.12.2009 | |
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
LT | 16.12.2009 | ||
LV | 16.12.2009 | ||
MT | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
IS | 16.04.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
HU | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 16.12.2009 | |
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
LT | 16.12.2009 | ||
LV | 16.12.2009 | ||
MT | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
IS | 16.04.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 16.12.2009 | |
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
LT | 16.12.2009 | ||
LV | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
IS | 16.04.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CY | 16.12.2009 | |
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
LT | 16.12.2009 | ||
LV | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
IS | 16.04.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | EE | 16.12.2009 | |
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
LT | 16.12.2009 | ||
LV | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
IS | 16.04.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | FI | 16.12.2009 | |
LT | 16.12.2009 | ||
LV | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19608048 (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [A] 1-18 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 56; figures 1-3 * * abstract *; | [A]EP1393977 (OMNISTOR ACCESSORIES NV [BE]) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0008] - [0024]; figures 1-5 * * abstract *; | [A]EP1449722 (GROUPE MECALAC [FR]) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0016] - [0025]; figures 1-6 * * abstract *; | [A]EP1470959 (ZEPPENFELD IND VERWALTUNGS GMB [DE]) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0006] - [0017]; figures 1-12 * * abstract *; | [A]WO2006078195 (VOLVO LASTVAGNAR AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-18* abstract * |