EP1913833 - Reverse opening type separable end stop of slide fastener [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YKK Corporation 1, Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8642 / JP | [2008/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogura, Suguru c/o YKK CORPORATION, Kurobe 200, Yoshida Kurobe-shi, Toyama, 938-8601 / JP | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/50] | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/17] | Casalonga, Axel, et al Bureau Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07020128.0 | 15.10.2007 | [2008/17] | Priority number, date | JP20060286654 | 20.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006286654 | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1913833 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1913833 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A44B19/38 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
A44B19/382 (EP,US);
A44B19/34 (KR);
A44B19/30 (KR);
A44B19/36 (KR);
Y10T24/2593 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2009/01] |
Former [2008/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Teilbarem Endanschlag für gegenläufige Öffnung des Reissverschlusses | [2008/17] | English: | Reverse opening type separable end stop of slide fastener | [2008/17] | French: | Butée séparable à ouverture inversée pour fermeture à glissière | [2008/17] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 04.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1201147 (YKK CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP1570758 (YKK CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5* paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1-11 *; | [PX]US2006282998 (KUSAYAMA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [PX] 1-5 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1-8 * |