Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
09.04.2012 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
28.10.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.10.2011 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
15.09.2011 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
28.07.2011 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
18.03.2011 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
18.03.2011 | First examination report | |
31.12.2010 | Definitive list of designations | published on 02.02.2011 [2011/05] |
03.12.2010 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] |
08.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant | |
21.10.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.04.2010 | Publication of search report | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] |
22.10.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] |
18.04.2008 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |