Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0622770D0 | 27.12.2006 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0622770 | 15.11.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0713992D0 | 29.08.2007 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0713992 | 18.07.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7850188 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2010 | B2 | US2008111339 | 15.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0713992 | 18.07.2007 | GB0622770 | 15.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1923618 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2010 | A3 | EP1923618 | 21.05.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0713992 | 18.07.2007 | GB0622770 | 15.11.2006 |