EP1916719 - Method of making phosphor based light sources having an interference reflector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2008/18] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ouderkirk, Andrew J. c/o 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Weber, Michael F. c/o 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
Wheatley, John A. c/o 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2008/18] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/18] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07020411.0 | 27.01.2004 | [2008/18] | Priority number, date | US20030443232P | 27.01.2003 Original published format: US 443232 P | US20030443235P | 27.01.2003 Original published format: US 443235 P | US20030443274P | 27.01.2003 Original published format: US 443274 P | US20030727023 | 02.12.2003 Original published format: US 727023 | [2008/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1916719 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/18] | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00 | [2008/18] | CPC: |
H01L33/505 (EP);
H01L2224/48091 (EP);
H01L2224/48247 (EP);
H01L2924/12041 (EP);
H01L2924/181 (EP);
H01L33/44 (EP);
H01L33/60 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Lichtquellen auf Phosphorbasis mit Interferenzreflektor | [2008/18] | English: | Method of making phosphor based light sources having an interference reflector | [2008/18] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de sources lumineuses à base de phosphore, dotées d'un réflecteur d'interférences | [2008/18] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/30] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04705580.1 / EP1588426 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |