EP1985897 - Flat metal gasket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REINZ-Dichtungs-GmbH Reinzstrasse 3-7 89233 Neu-Ulm / DE | [2008/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Egloff, Georg Reutestrasse 6 89264 Weißenhorn / DE | 02 /
Unseld, Günther Silcherstrasse 11 89189 Neenstetten / DE | 03 /
Höhe, Kurt Dahlienweg 17 89129 Langenau / DE | [2008/44] | Representative(s) | Tomerius, Isabel, et al Lang & Tomerius Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Rosa-Bavarese-Strasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Tomerius, Isabel, et al Lang & Tomerius Patentanwälte Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07020452.4 | 18.10.2007 | [2008/44] | Priority number, date | EP20070008321 | 24.04.2007 Original published format: EP 07008321 | [2008/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1985897 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/08, F02F11/00 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
F16J15/0818 (EP,US);
F16J15/0825 (EP,US);
F16J2015/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/44] | Title | German: | Metallische Flachdichtung | [2008/44] | English: | Flat metal gasket | [2008/44] | French: | Joint plat métallique | [2008/44] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 14.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/44] | 17.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9522020 (STECHER FRIEDHELM [DE]); | [YD]EP1065417 (NIPPON GASKET KK [JP]); | [Y]JP2004144119 (NIPPON REINZ CO LTD); | [YA]WO2004076893 (REINZ DICHTUNGS GMBH [DE], et al); | [XY]EP1628050 (REINZ DICHTUNGS GMBH [DE]); | [Y]DE202006003678U (ELRINGKLINGER AG [DE]) | by applicant | EP1065417 | WO0196768 | JP2004144119 | WO2004076893 | DE102004011721 | EP1628050 | EP20070008321 |