EP1921202 - Method for determining the load in a washer-drier and washer-drier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E.G.O. Elektro-Gerätebau GmbH Rote-Tor-Strasse 14 75038 Oberderdingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states E.G.O. ELEKTRO-GERÄTEBAU GmbH Rote-Tor-Strasse 14 75038 Oberderdingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Münzner, Rainer Alte Annabergerstrasse 44 08340 Schwarzenberg / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Kay Albert-Schweitzer-Strasse 29 76676 Graben-Neudorf / DE | [2008/20] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07020564.6 | 20.10.2007 | [2008/20] | Priority number, date | DE20061053274 | 06.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006053274 | [2008/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1921202 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1921202 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/28 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
D06F34/18 (EP,US);
D06F2103/02 (EP,US);
D06F2103/04 (EP,US);
D06F2103/08 (EP,US);
D06F2103/34 (EP,US);
D06F2105/52 (EP,US);
D06F2105/58 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Ermitteln der Ladungsmenge in einem Wäschetrockner und Wäschetrockner | [2008/20] | English: | Method for determining the load in a washer-drier and washer-drier | [2008/20] | French: | Procédé destiné à la détermination de la quantité de chargement dans un séche-linge et sèche-linge | [2008/20] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 26.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/40] | 27.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4733479 (KAJI SHINICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,12 * column 6, line 42 - column 7, line 8; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US5050313 (WAKAEYA SHINJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,6,12 * column 10, line 24 - line 32; claim 1 ** column 16, line 35 - column 17, line 38; figure 12a *; | [X]US6122840 (CHBAT NICOLAS WADIH [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * column 2, line 8 - column 5, line 10; figures 1-4B * | by applicant | US4733479 | US5050313 | DE4243594 | US6122840 | EP1067233 | EP1295979 |