EP1887475 - Interface for serial data communication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2008/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ede, Clifford 86 Rydes Hill Road Guildford Surrey GU2 9UG / GB | [2012/31] |
Former [2008/07] | 01 /
Ede, Clifford 86 Rydes Hill Road Guildford Surrey GU2 9UG / GB | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/31] | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | ||
Former [2008/07] | Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07020870.7 | 17.11.2004 | [2008/07] | Priority number, date | GB20030027216 | 22.11.2003 Original published format: GB 0327216 | [2008/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1887475 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1887475 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | [2008/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1887475 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
G06F13/4081 (EP,US);
G06F13/14 (KR);
G06F13/38 (KR);
G06F2213/0042 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/07] | Title | German: | Schnittstelle zur seriellen Datenkommunikation | [2008/07] | English: | Interface for serial data communication | [2008/07] | French: | Interface pour communication de données en série | [2008/07] | Examination procedure | 15.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 23.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04798901.7 / EP1685496 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040798901) is 29.03.2007 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.11.2004 | AT | 01.08.2012 | BE | 01.08.2012 | CY | 01.08.2012 | CZ | 01.08.2012 | EE | 01.08.2012 | FI | 01.08.2012 | IT | 01.08.2012 | PL | 01.08.2012 | SE | 01.08.2012 | SI | 01.08.2012 | SK | 01.08.2012 | TR | 01.08.2012 | BG | 01.11.2012 | GR | 02.11.2012 | ES | 12.11.2012 | GB | 17.11.2012 | IE | 17.11.2012 | LU | 17.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | FR | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | IS | 01.12.2012 | PT | 03.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
TR | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
GB | 17.11.2012 | ||
IE | 17.11.2012 | ||
LU | 17.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
TR | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
GB | 17.11.2012 | ||
IE | 17.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
GB | 17.11.2012 | ||
IE | 17.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IE | 17.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IE | 17.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 01.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03029996 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003204652 (SAITO NOBUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [X] - DAVID LUKE, "Linking Mobiles with USB: A Look at the OTG Supplement", COMMS DESIGN, (20030109), URL: http://www.commsdesign.com/printableArticle/?articleID=16500233, (20080121), XP002465441 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * |