EP1918999 - Method for producing single crystal silicon solar cell and single crystal silicon solar cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/19] | Method for producing thin film mono-crystalline silicon solar cell and corresponding solar cell | ||
[2016/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2008/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Atsuo c/o Advanced Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-13-1 Isobe Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Akiyama, Shoji c/o Advanced Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-13-1 Isobe Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | 03 /
Kawai, Makoto c/o Advanced Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-13-1 Isobe Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | 04 /
Tanaka, Koichi c/o Advanced Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-13-1 Isobe Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | 05 /
Tobisaka, Yuuji c/o Advanced Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-13-1 Isobe Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | 06 /
Kubota, Yoshihiro c/o Advanced Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-13-1 Isobe Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | [2017/16] |
Former [2008/19] | 01 /
Ito, Atsuo c/o Advanced Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-13-1 Isobe Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Akiyama, Shoji c/o Advanced Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-13-1 Isobe Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Kawai, Makoto c/o Advanced Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-13-1 Isobe Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Tanaka, Koichi c/o Advanced Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-13-1 Isobe Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Tobisaka, Yuuji c/o Advanced Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-13-1 Isobe Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | |||
06 /
Kubota, Yoshihiro c/o Advanced Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-13-1 Isobe Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/16] | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/19] | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07020915.0 | 25.10.2007 | [2008/19] | Priority number, date | JP20060294605 | 30.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006294605 | [2008/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1918999 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1918999 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/18 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
H01L31/1804 (EP,US);
H01L31/04 (KR);
H01L31/06 (KR);
H01L31/18 (KR);
H01L31/1896 (EP,US);
Y02B10/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR [2017/16] |
Former [2009/03] | BE, DE, FR | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer einkristallinen Silizium Solarzelle und einkristalline Silizium Solarzelle | [2017/15] | English: | Method for producing single crystal silicon solar cell and single crystal silicon solar cell | [2017/15] | French: | Procédé de production d'une cellule solaire en silicium monocrystallin et cellule solaire en silicium monocrystallin | [2017/15] |
Former [2008/19] | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer einkristallinen Silizium-Dünnschicht in einer Solarzelle sowie entsprechende Solarzelle | ||
Former [2008/19] | Method for producing thin film mono-crystalline silicon solar cell and corresponding solar cell | ||
Former [2008/19] | Procédé de production d'une cellule solaire à couche mince en silicium monocrystallin et cellule solaire correspondante | Examination procedure | 07.11.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 08.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.03.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 09.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.10.2017 | [2018/39] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9852216 (SILICON GENESIS CORP [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 1, line 24 *; | [Y]DE19936941 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * columns 3,5,6 * * column 4, lines 53-61 *; | [A]WO0175976 (HAHN MEITNER INST BERLIN GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,4,5,7,8 * abstract * * page 11, lines 10-12 * * page 12, lines 5-12 * * page 17 * * page 20 *; | [A]JP2003017723 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK) [A] 1,6,7 * abstract *; | [A]WO03058725 (REVEO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 20 *; | [A]US2004009649 (KUB FRANCIS J [US], et al) [A] 2 * paragraph [0081] *; | [A]GB2405030 (UNIV LOUGHBOROUGH [GB], et al) [A] 7 * abstract *; | [PX]WO2007109568 (SILICON GENESIS CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1-7 * abstract ** paragraphs [0089] , [0095] , [0096] *; | [Y] - SHAH A V ET AL, "Thin-film silicon solar cell technology", PROGRESS IN PHOTOVOLTAICS. RESEARCH AND APPLICATIONS, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, CHICHESTER, GB, (2004), vol. 12, no. 2-3, ISSN 1062-7995, pages 113 - 142, XP002352085 [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [04.1] * * page 135, line 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pip.533 |