EP1926184 - Electric connector for mounting on a wall [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coninvers GmbH Heisenbergstrasse 1 71083 Herrenberg / DE | [2009/09] |
Former [2008/22] | For all designated states Coninvers Elektrotechnische Bauelemente GmbH Heisenbergstrasse 1 71083 Herrenberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thelen, Maik Buchrainweg 5 71088 Holzgerlingen / DE | [2008/22] | Representative(s) | Klocke, Peter ABACUS Patentanwälte Lise-Meitner-Strasse 21 72202 Nagold / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Klocke, Peter ABACUS Patentanwälte Klocke Späth Barth European Patent and Trademark Attorneys Kappelstrasse 8 72160 Horb / DE | ||
Former [2008/22] | Klocke, Peter ABACUS Patentanwälte, Klocke Späth Barth, Kappelstrasse 8 72160 Horb / DE | Application number, filing date | 07021375.6 | 02.11.2007 | [2008/22] | Priority number, date | DE20062017885U | 22.11.2006 Original published format: DE 202006017885 U | [2008/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1926184 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1926184 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/74 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
H01R13/748 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/20] |
Former [2008/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrischer Steckverbinder zur Wandbefestigung | [2008/22] | English: | Electric connector for mounting on a wall | [2008/22] | French: | Connecteur à fiches électrique destiné à la fixation murale | [2008/22] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | deleted | Deletion: Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/18] | 28.02.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0355276 (SCHALTBAU GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * column 2, lines 2-46 * * column 4, lines 32-39 * * column 7, lines 2-54 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO9853530 (BRANTNER ASS INC [US]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 33 * * page 8, line 35 - page 9, line 6 * * page 10, line 10 - page 11, line 21 * * figures 3-5,7,8a,8b *; | [Y]DE20121000U (WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * abstract ** figures 1,2 * | by applicant | EP0355276 | WO9853530 | DE20007171U | DE20121000U |