blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1932981

EP1932981 - Assembly kit for a grandstand [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.07.2016
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.08.2016  [2016/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lichtgitter GmbH
Siemensstrasse 1
48703 Stadtlohn / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/25]For all designated states
Lichtgitter GmbH
Siemensstrasse
48703 Stadtlohn / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Haller, Karlheinz
Falkenstrasse 7/1
72172 Sulz-Sigmarswangen / DE
 [2008/25]
Representative(s)Habbel, Ludwig, et al
Habbel & Habbel
Patentanwälte
Am Kanonengraben 11
48151 Münster / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/25]Habbel, Hans-Georg
Habbel & Habbel, Patentanwälte, Am Kanonengraben 11
48151 Münster / DE
Application number, filing date07021442.403.11.2007
[2008/25]
Priority number, dateDE20062018817U13.12.2006         Original published format: DE 202006018817 U
[2008/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1932981
Date:18.06.2008
Language:DE
[2008/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1932981
Date:08.07.2015
Language:DE
[2015/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.2015
ClassificationIPC:E04H3/12
[2008/25]
CPC:
E04H3/12 (EP)
Designated contracting states[2016/11]
Former [2008/25]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bausatz für eine Tribüne[2008/25]
English:Assembly kit for a grandstand[2008/25]
French:Kit pour une tribune[2008/25]
Examination procedure09.01.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/31]
29.02.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
19.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
20.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
18.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200903   M06   Not yet paid
30.11.201509   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2171374  (RYAN RUDD W, et al) [A] 1-7 * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 46; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US3070849  (IRWIN ALEXANDER J) [A] 1-7* page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 45; figures 1-2 *;
 [A]DE2001244  (TELLENBACH FA HELMUT) [A] 1-7 * page 2, line 1 - page 11, line 6; figures 1-12 *;
 [A]US5159788  (MERRICK BRUCE C [US]) [A] 1-7 * column 3, line 18 - column 6, line 15; figures 1-12 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.