EP1919160 - Method and apparatus for session negotiation in a mobile communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Soeng-Hun Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Jeong, Kyeong-In Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Song, O-Sok Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Van Lieshout, Gert Jan Samsung Electronics Research Institute Communication House South Street Staines, Middlesex TW18 4QE / GB | 05 /
Van der Velde, Himke Samsung Electronics Research Institute Communication House South Street Staines, Middlesex TW18 4QE / GB | [2008/19] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/19] | Lang, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenberg Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07021586.8 | 06.11.2007 | [2008/19] | Priority number, date | KR20060109179 | 06.11.2006 Original published format: KR 20060109179 | KR20070076987 | 31.07.2007 Original published format: KR 20070076987 | [2008/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1919160 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, // H04Q7/38 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04W72/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2009/03] |
Former [2008/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Sitzungsverhandlung in einem mobilen Kommunikationssystem | [2008/19] | English: | Method and apparatus for session negotiation in a mobile communication system | [2008/19] | French: | Procédé et appareil de négociation de session dans un système de communications mobile | [2008/19] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 08.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 26.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - SAMSUNG, "VoIP support in LTE", 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP); TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION GROUP (TSG) RADIO ACCESS NETWORK (RAN); WORKING GROUP 2 (WG2), XX, XX, (20060828), vol. R2-62218, pages 1 - 3, XP002447189 [X] 1-14 * section 3 * | [X] - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "Uplink resource allocation scheme, 3GPP TSG RAN WG2 #54, R2-062164", 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP); TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION GROUP (TSG) RADIO ACCESS NETWORK (RAN); WORKING GROUP 2 (WG2), XX, XX, (20060828), no. 54, pages 1 - 5, XP002460801 [X] 1-14 * section 2.2 * | [X] - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "Persistent Scheduling", INTERNET CITATION, (20060627), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg-ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_AHS/2006_06_LTE/Docs/R2 061920.zip, (2008), XP003016942 [X] 1-14 * section 2.2 * |