EP2025361 - Tank filters adaptable for placement with a guide wire, in series with the lead wires or circuits of active medical devices to enhance MRI compatibility [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Greatbatch Ltd. 10,000 Wehrle Drive Clarence, NY 14031 / US | [2009/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stevenson, Robert A. 15349 Iron Canyon Road Canyon Country CA 91387 / US | 02 /
Frysz, Christine 26 Lakeridge Drive Orchard Park New York 14127 / US | 03 /
Dabney, Warren 76 Graystone Lane Orchard Park New York 14127 / US | 04 /
Brendel, Richard L. 1551 Jefferson Drive Carson City Nevada 89706 / US | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Richter, Werdermann, Gerbaulet & Hofmann Patentanwälte Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2009/08] | Richter, Werdermann, Gerbaulet & Hofmann Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07021770.8 | 09.11.2007 | [2009/08] | Priority number, date | US20070838035 | 13.08.2007 Original published format: US 838035 | [2009/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2025361 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05, A61N1/08, A61N1/16 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
A61N1/3754 (EP,US);
A61N1/05 (EP,US);
A61N1/086 (EP,US);
A61N1/3718 (EP,US);
H03H7/01 (EP,US);
A61N1/056 (EP,US);
A61N1/0565 (EP,US);
A61N1/0573 (EP,US);
H01G4/35 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] | Title | German: | Notch-Filter zur Verbesserung von MRI-Kompatibilität, in Serienschaltung mit Elektrodenleitung oder Schaltkreisen von aktiven medizinischen Geräten und anpassbar zur Aufnahme eines Führungsdrahtes | [2009/08] | English: | Tank filters adaptable for placement with a guide wire, in series with the lead wires or circuits of active medical devices to enhance MRI compatibility | [2009/08] | French: | Filtres réjecteur adaptables pour la mise en place d'un guide-fil, en série avec les fils conducteurs ou circuits de dispositifs médicaux actifs pour améliorer la compatibilité de l'IRM | [2009/08] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 23.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/30] | 10.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9636282 (BAXTER INT [US], et al); | [A]US2005222647 (WAHLSTRAND CARL D [US], et al); | [A]US2005256558 (GEISTERT WOLFANG [DE]); | [Y]US2006106445 (WOOLLETT IAN [US]); | [Y]US2007112398 (STEVENSON ROBERT A [US], et al) | by applicant | US4424551 | US4799499 | US4858623 | US5300108 | US5333095 | US5514173 | US5545201 | US5716390 | US5741321 | US5751539 | US5759202 | US5905627 | US5959829 | US5973906 | US5978204 | US6008980 | US6055457 | US6141594 | US6159560 | US6275369 | US6424234 | US6456481 | US6473291 | US6493591 | US6529103 | US6566978 | US6567259 | US6643903 | US6675779 | US6687550 | US6765780 | US6765779 | US6876885 | US6882248 | US6931286 | US2005197677 | US6952613 | US6985347 | US6999818 | US7092766 | US2006212096 | US7113387 | US2007083244 | US20060767484 |