EP1938746 - Probe device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ninomiya, Atsushi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12F, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyuda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Kasai, Yoshimi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12F, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Hirabayashi, Yukiko c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12F, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2010/01] |
Former [2008/27] | 01 /
Ninomiya, Atsushi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12F, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyuda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | ||
02 /
Kasai, Yoshimi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intelectual Property Group 12F, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
03 /
Hirabayashi, Yukiko c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intelectual Property Group 12F, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2008/27] | Application number, filing date | 07021951.4 | 12.11.2007 | [2008/27] | Priority number, date | JP20060350850 | 27.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006350850 | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1938746 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1938746 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
A61B5/0059 (EP,US);
A61B5/14552 (EP,US);
A61B5/14553 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2009/11] |
Former [2008/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sondenvorrichtung | [2008/27] | English: | Probe device | [2008/27] | French: | Dispositif de sonde | [2008/27] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 02.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 07.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5038782 (GEVINS ALAN S [US], et al) [A] 1* column 4, line 54 - column 9, line 59 *; | [Y]WO0045701 (ADVANCED BRAIN MONITORING INC [US]) [Y] 1-12 * page 13, line 10 - page 14, line 31 * * page 16, line 4 - page 17, line 10 * * page 19, lines 5-14 * * figures 1,3,4,5A,5B,6,12-17 *; | [A]US6201982 (MENKES ALEX [US], et al) [A] 1-5,10-12 * figures 1,3,6-11 * * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 37 * * column 7, lines 18-44 *; | [Y]US2004054271 (MAKI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0030] , [0034] , [0044] - [0046] - [0059] , [0080] * * figures 1,2a,4 * | by applicant | WO0045701 | US2004054271 |