EP2060289 - Administration device comprising indication unit and method for setting a dose [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F.HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Remde, Axel Dorfstrasse 42A 3432 Lützelflüh-Goldbach / CH | [2009/21] | Representative(s) | Poredda, Andreas C/o Disetronic Medical Systems AG Patentabteilung Kirchbergstrasse 190 3401 Burgdorf / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | Poredda, Andreas Disetronic Medical Systems AG Kirchbergstrasse 190 3401 Burgdorf / CH | Application number, filing date | 07021986.0 | 13.11.2007 | [2009/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2060289 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/315, // A61M5/31 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
A61M5/31525 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3125 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3126 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3584 (EP,US);
A61M2205/50 (EP,US);
A61M2205/52 (EP,US);
A61M2205/581 (EP,US);
A61M2205/582 (EP,US);
A61M2205/583 (EP,US);
A61M2205/587 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2010/04] |
Former [2009/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verabreichungsvorrichtung mit Anzeigeeinheit und Methode zur Dosiseinstellungen | [2009/21] | English: | Administration device comprising indication unit and method for setting a dose | [2009/21] | French: | Dispositif d'administration comprenant une unité d'indication et méthode pour afficher une dose | [2009/21] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/24] | 07.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE29904864U (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG [DE]); | [XY]EP1498067 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]WO2007056592 (M2 MEDICAL AS [DK], et al); | [X]WO2007107431 (SHL MEDICAL AB [SE], et al) | by applicant | WO9316740 | WO9316743 | WO9736625 | US6482185 |