EP2061284 - Method and System providing a short message (SMS) forwarding unconditional service [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [2013/45] |
Former [2009/21] | For all designated states T-Mobile International AG Landgrabenweg 151 53227 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johan, Alexandr Dubescská 1767 Praha 10 zip Code 100 00 / CZ | [2009/21] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Rennerle 10 88131 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/49] | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10 88131 Lindau / DE | ||
Former [2009/21] | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10 88131 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 07022166.8 | 15.11.2007 | [2009/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2061284 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2061284 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/14, // H04W4/16 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
H04W4/14 (EP,US);
H04W4/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/21] | H04W84/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Bereitstellung eines Dienstes zur bedingungslosen Weiterleitung von Kurznachrichten (SMS) | [2009/21] | English: | Method and System providing a short message (SMS) forwarding unconditional service | [2009/21] | French: | Procédé et système fournissant une service de transferts des messages courts (SMS) inconditionelle | [2009/21] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 16.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 04.12.2013 | BG | 04.12.2013 | CY | 04.12.2013 | DK | 04.12.2013 | EE | 04.12.2013 | FI | 04.12.2013 | LT | 04.12.2013 | LV | 04.12.2013 | MC | 04.12.2013 | MT | 04.12.2013 | SE | 04.12.2013 | SI | 04.12.2013 | IS | 04.04.2014 | PT | 04.04.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/25] | BE | 04.12.2013 | |
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | BE | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | BE | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | BE | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | BE | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | BE | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 04.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0122751 (SONERA OYJ [FI], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,9,11,13,14 * abstract * * figures 1,6 * * page 6, line 15 - page 8, line 13 * * page 11, line 11 - page 12, line 4 ** claim 1 *; | [X]EP1294201 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,6-9,13,14 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] * * claims 1-3 *; | [X]WO2004107785 (VODAFONE HOLDING GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,5-7,9,12-14 * figure 2 * * abstract * * page 5, line 19 - page 7, line 20 *; | [X]US2005036457 (SALIN HANNU-PEKKA [FI]) [X] 1-3,7,9,10,13,14 * figures 1,2 * * claim 1 * * paragraphs [0025] - [0029] * * paragraphs [0033] - [0037] *; | [E]WO2008006462 (T MOBILE INT AG & CO KG [DE], et al) [E] 1-14 * figures 1,2 * * claims 1-5,11,12 * * page 4, line 1 - page 6, line 4 * | by applicant | WO0122751 | EP1294201 | WO2004107785 | US2005036457 |