EP1926193 - A locking construction, connector provided therewith and unlocking method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city Mie 510-8503 / JP | [2013/31] |
Former [2008/22] | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-City Mie, 510-8503 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Tomohiko c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city Mie 510-8503 / JP | 02 /
Hata, Takao c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city Mie 510-8503 / JP | [2013/14] |
Former [2008/22] | 01 /
Kobayashi, Tomohiko Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city Mie 510-8503 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/22] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07022313.6 | 16.11.2007 | [2008/22] | Priority number, date | JP20060317610 | 24.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006317610 | [2008/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1926193 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1926193 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/30 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
H01R13/633 (EP,US);
H01R13/629 (KR);
F16B21/073 (EP,US);
H01R13/6273 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2009/06] |
Former [2008/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verriegelungskonstruktion, Steckverbinder damit und Entriegelungsverfahren | [2008/22] | English: | A locking construction, connector provided therewith and unlocking method | [2008/22] | French: | Construction de verrouillage, connecteur doté de celle-ci et procédé de déverrouillage | [2008/22] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 11.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2300290 (ITT PRODUITS IND [FR]) [A] 10* page 5, line 32 - page 6, line 10; figures 5,6 *; | [A]JPH06245348 (YAZAKI CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US5675128 (SIMON HANS [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 19 - column 4, line 28; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US2005029005 (ARAI HIROAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0059]; figures 1-6 * | by applicant | JPH089532 |