EP2061215 - Test module and test method for relevance testing of an identifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vector Informatik GmbH Ingersheimer Strasse 24 70499 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pongs, Tobias Gastäckerstr. 21 70794 Filderstadt / DE | [2009/21] | Representative(s) | Bregenzer, Michael Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | Bregenzer, Michael Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | ||
Former [2009/21] | Bregenzer, Michael Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07022333.4 | 17.11.2007 | [2009/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2061215 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2061215 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/12, // H04L29/08 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
H04L61/35 (EP);
H04L2101/604 (EP);
H04L67/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2010/04] |
Former [2009/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Prüfmodul und Prüfverfahren zur Relevanzprüfung eines Kennzeichners | [2009/21] | English: | Test module and test method for relevance testing of an identifier | [2009/21] | French: | Module de contrôle et procédé de contrôle pour le contrôle de pertinence d'une identification | [2009/21] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 21.11.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.12.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   16.12.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1069731 (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1-17* paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0029] *; | [DX]EP1223725 (VECTOR INFORMATIK GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1-17 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0064]; figures 5-8 * | by applicant | EP1223725 |