EP1900651 - Apparatus for fabricating an insulated container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEDA S.p.A. Corso Salvatore d'Amato 84 80022 Arzano Napoli / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | For all designated states SEDA S.p.A. Corso Salvatore d'Amato 84 80022 Arzano-Napoli / IT | ||
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states SEDA S.p.A. Corso Salvatore d'Amato 84 I-80022 Arzano-Napoli / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
D'Amato, Gianfranco Corso Salvatore D'Amato 84 80022 arzano Napoli / IT | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/12] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07022427.4 | 01.09.2005 | [2008/12] | Priority number, date | US20050672195P | 15.04.2005 Original published format: US 672195 P | [2008/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1900651 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1900651 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/38, B65D3/22, B29C65/02 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
B29C65/02 (EP,NO);
B65D3/22 (EP,KR,NO,RU);
B29C65/7847 (EP,NO);
B29C66/02242 (NO);
B29C66/0242 (EP);
B29C66/21 (EP,NO);
B29C66/545 (EP,NO);
B29C66/63 (EP,NO);
B29C66/72328 (EP);
B29C66/7392 (EP);
B29C66/73921 (NO);
B29C66/80 (EP,NO);
B29C66/8322 (EP,NO);
B65D81/38 (KR);
B65D81/3869 (EP,NO);
B29C66/3452 (EP);
B29C66/71 (EP);
B29K2023/06 (EP);
B29K2711/123 (EP);
B29L2009/00 (EP);
B29L2024/00 (EP);
B29L2031/7132 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/12] | Extension states | AL | 11.09.2008 | BA | 11.09.2008 | HR | 11.09.2008 | MK | 11.09.2008 | YU | 11.09.2008 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines isolierten Behälters | [2008/12] | English: | Apparatus for fabricating an insulated container | [2008/12] | French: | Appareil pour la fabrication d'un conteneur isolé | [2008/12] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 27.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05019031.3 / EP1712490 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050019031) is 03.01.2007 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.03.2012 | EE | 07.03.2012 | LT | 07.03.2012 | LV | 07.03.2012 | IS | 07.07.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | [2013/20] |
Former [2012/49] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | LT | 07.03.2012 | |
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 07.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4007670 (ALBANO JOHN V, et al); | [DX]US4344814 (MCLAREN EDWIN C); | [A]DE20110390U (ZIMMERMANN JENS [DE]); | [A]WO03057577 (RUNDPACK AG [CH], et al) | by applicant | US2266828 | US4007670 | US4344814 | US5145107 | US5460323 | US5524817 | US5685480 | JP2001293802 | JP2001294282 | US6663926 |