EP2060805 - Method for producing a hydrodynamic thrust bearing and hydrodynamic thrust bearing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANMARKS TEKNISKE UNIVERSITET Afdelingen for Forskning og Innovation Bygning 101A Anker Egelundsvej 1 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2009/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klit, Peder No̸rredamsvej 124 3480 Fredensborg / DK | 02 /
Thomsen, Kim Overgårdsvej 24 7430 Ikast / DK | [2009/21] | Representative(s) | Jensen, Peter Kim, et al Chas. Hude A/S H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 1780 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | Jensen, Peter Kim, et al C/o Chas. Hude A/S H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 DK-1780 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 07022435.7 | 19.11.2007 | [2009/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2060805 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16C17/06 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
F16C17/065 (EP);
F16C33/108 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/04] |
Former [2009/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines hydrodynamischen Axiallagers und hydrodynamisches Axiallager | [2009/21] | English: | Method for producing a hydrodynamic thrust bearing and hydrodynamic thrust bearing | [2009/21] | French: | Procédé de production d'une butée hydrodynamique et butée hydrodynamique | [2009/21] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/20] | 05.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS58180818 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 9 * abstract *; | [X]JPS58180823 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 9 * abstract *; | [X]JPS58180824 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 9 * abstract *; | [X]JPS58180825 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 9* abstract *; | [X]JPS61112815 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 9,10 * abstract *; | [XAY]US5616098 (KATAYAMA MASANORI [JP], et al) [X] 9-12,14 * column 5, lines 6-19; figures 5,6 * [A] 1 [Y] 13; | [XY]DE10260885 (MAIN METALL GIESSEREI FRITZ SC [DE]) [X] 9,11,12 * paragraphs [0042] - [0044]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 13 |