EP1894753 - Structure for enabling independently suspended wheels to lean with vehicle hull [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH INSTITUTE No. 195, Sec. 4, Chung Hsing Rd. Chutung Hsinchu / TW | [2008/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peng, Yu-Yin No. 28, Alley 2, Lane 221 Gaocui Rd. Hsinchu City 300 / TW | 02 /
Jiaung, Wen -Shu No. 19, Lane 73 Xianhui Rd. Toufen Town Maioli County 351 / TW | 03 /
Li, Cheng-Ho No.21, Alley 22 Lane 236 Nanshan Rd. Zhonghe City Taipei County 235 / TW | [2010/19] |
Former [2008/10] | 01 /
Peng, Yu-Yin No. 28, Alley 2, Lane 221 Gaocui Rd. Hsinchu City 300 / TW | ||
02 /
Jiaung, Wen -Shu No. 19, Lane 73 Xianhui Rd. Toufen Town Maioli County 351 / TW | |||
03 /
Li, Cheong-Ho No.21, Alley 22 Lane 236 Nanshan Rd. Zhonghe City Taipei County 235 / TW | Representative(s) | Negendanck, Matthias Dr.-Ing. Dipl.-Phys. Univ. Matthias Negendanck Patentmanufaktur Rennweg 60-62 90489 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | Negendanck, Matthias Nordostpark 78 90411 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07022449.8 | 26.06.2006 | [2008/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1894753 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1894753 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | [2008/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1894753 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60G3/20, B62D9/02 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
B60G3/20 (EP);
B62K5/10 (EP);
B60G2200/46 (EP);
B60G2300/122 (EP);
B60G2300/45 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/10] | Title | German: | Struktur um das Neigen unabhängig aufgehängter Räder mit der Fahrzeughülle zu ermöglichen | [2008/10] | English: | Structure for enabling independently suspended wheels to lean with vehicle hull | [2008/10] | French: | Structure pour permettre à des roues suspendues de manière indépendante de s'incliner avec la coque de véhicule | [2008/10] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 04.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06013097.8 / EP1872981 | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.05.2010 | CZ | 12.05.2010 | DK | 12.05.2010 | EE | 12.05.2010 | FI | 12.05.2010 | LT | 12.05.2010 | LV | 12.05.2010 | PL | 12.05.2010 | RO | 12.05.2010 | SE | 12.05.2010 | SI | 12.05.2010 | SK | 12.05.2010 | TR | 12.05.2010 | CY | 26.05.2010 | IE | 26.06.2010 | LU | 26.06.2010 | CH | 30.06.2010 | LI | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | BG | 12.08.2010 | GR | 13.08.2010 | ES | 23.08.2010 | IS | 12.09.2010 | PT | 13.09.2010 | HU | 13.11.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
TR | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
IE | 26.06.2010 | ||
LU | 26.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
HU | 13.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
IE | 26.06.2010 | ||
LU | 26.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
HU | 13.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
IE | 26.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
HU | 13.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
IE | 26.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
IE | 26.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
IE | 26.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2961254 (JOSEF MULLER) [A] 1 * column 4, line 72 - line 75; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4159128 (BLAINE TED E [US]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US4550926 (MACISAAC WILLIAM L [US]) [A] 1 * figures 2,4-6 *; | [A]US4854603 (SCADUTO ONOFRIO [US]) [A] 1 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]GB2279047 (DOVISON DAVID [GB]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 16 - line 18; figures 2,5-8 *; | [YA]DE19533669 (CHRIST WOLFGANG DIPL ING [DE]) [Y] 3-9 * column 4, line 25 - line 59; figures 2,7 * [A] 1; | [A]DE29615913U (WEISS WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 5,6 *; | [A]EP0900713 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE19838328 (SCHLIEWERT FRANK [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 29 - line 31; figure 4b *; | [A]EP0983883 (SIEBEN HANS HERMANN [DE]); | [XA]FR2858963 (FAYE JEAN CLAUDE [FR]) [X] 1 * page 10, line 13 - line 16; figures 2-6 * * page 15, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 6, line 1 - line 31 * * page 15, line 2 * * page 5, line 21 - line 36; figures 7,8 * * page 15, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * [A] 19; | [XY]WO2005058680 (PIAGGIO & C SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1 * page 7, line 18 - page 8, line 11; figures 2a,2b * [Y] 3-9 | by applicant | US4887829 | US4998596 | DE19533669 | WO9721583 | US2004100059 | FR2858963 | WO2005058680 |