EP2063682 - Technique for platform-to-platform communication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2016/37] |
Former [2009/22] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lerzer, Jürgen Altenhofweg 67A 92318 Neumarkt/OPf / DE | 02 /
Möller, Bernd Rüblandenerstrasse 18 91239 Henfenfeld / DE | 03 /
Nourbakhsh, Seyed-Hami Zum Schlüsselstein 8B 90475 Nürnberg / DE | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | Boco IP Oy Ab Kansakoulukatu 3 00100 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2016/37] | Boco IP Oy Ab Itämerenkatu 5 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2009/22] | Röthinger, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07022590.9 | 21.11.2007 | [2009/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2063682 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2063682 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/06, H04L12/28, // H04W92/16 | [2016/17] | CPC: |
H04W88/06 (EP,US);
H04L12/2854 (EP,US);
H04W92/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/22] | H04W88/06, H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/37] |
Former [2009/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Kommunikation zwischen Plattformen | [2009/22] | English: | Technique for platform-to-platform communication | [2009/22] | French: | Technique pour une communication de plate-forme à plate-forme | [2009/22] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 15.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.11.2007 | AT | 14.09.2016 | BE | 14.09.2016 | CY | 14.09.2016 | CZ | 14.09.2016 | DK | 14.09.2016 | EE | 14.09.2016 | ES | 14.09.2016 | FI | 14.09.2016 | IT | 14.09.2016 | LT | 14.09.2016 | LV | 14.09.2016 | MC | 14.09.2016 | PL | 14.09.2016 | RO | 14.09.2016 | SE | 14.09.2016 | SI | 14.09.2016 | SK | 14.09.2016 | TR | 14.09.2016 | IE | 21.11.2016 | MT | 21.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | FR | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | BG | 14.12.2016 | GR | 15.12.2016 | IS | 14.01.2017 | PT | 16.01.2017 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 21.11.2007 | |
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
TR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 21.11.2007 | |
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 14.09.2016 | |
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | ES | 14.09.2016 | |
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 14.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1467582 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-29 * paragraphs [0002] - [0008] - [0027] - [0034] *; | [X]EP1467584 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-29 * paragraphs [0001] - [0014] * * figures 1c,2 *; | [X]US2005073977 (VANGHI VIERI [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,17-29 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0010] - [0043] , [0044] * * figure 2 *; | [X]GB2410861 (NEC TECHNOLOGIES [GB]) [X] 1,18-29 * abstract * * page 9, line 5 - page 11, line 33 *; | [X]US2007173283 (LIVET CATHERINE M [CA], et al) [X] 1-29 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0054] - [0065] * * figures 2-6 *; | [X]US2007183461 (EYAL ELAD [IL], et al) [X] 1-29 * paragraphs [0002] - [0009] - [0052] - [0054] * * figures 4,5 *; | [E]WO2008013878 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-29 * paragraphs [0005] - [0010] - [0021] , [0026] *; | [AD] - ANGANA GHOSH ET AL, "Open application environments in mobile devices: Focus on JME and Ericsson Mobile Platforms", ERICSSON REVIEW (INCL. ON), TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON, SE, (20051219), vol. 82, no. 2, ISSN 0014-0171, pages 82 - 91, XP002484529 [AD] 1-29 * the whole document * | Examination | - Andrew S. Tanenbaum, "Computer Networks - Remote Procedure Call", Computer Networks - Remote Procedure Call, Prentice Hall PTR, (20030101), pages 526 - 529, XP055061545 | - JINDAL ET AL, "Local Remote Procedure Call Extensions for Distributed Computer Environment", IP.COM JOURNAL, IP.COM INC., WEST HENRIETTA, NY, US, (19941201), ISSN 1533-0001, XP013102465 | - ALAN CARLTON ET AL, "MEDIA INDEPENDENT HANDOVER Functions and Services Specification", INTERNET CITATION, (20050711), URL: http://www.ieee802.org/21/doctree/2005-07_meeting_docs/21-05-0299-00-0000-InterDigital3GPPInteraction.doc, (20070321), XP002426102 | by applicant | WO0022857 | US7149510 | - A. GHOSH ET AL., "Open application environments in mobile devices: Focus on JME and Ericsson Mobile Platforms", ERICSSON REVIEW, (2005), vol. 82, no. 2, pages 82 - 91, XP002484529 |