EP1925408 - Die cutting device and counter cutting cylinder for a die cutting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WINK Stanzwerkzeuge GmbH & Co. KG Lerchenstrasse 12-18 49838 Neuenhaus / DE | [2008/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Linnemann, Alfons Schlenkhoffs Weg 29 59269 Beckum / DE | [2008/22] | Representative(s) | Schütte, Hartmut, et al BSB Anwaltskanzlei Am Markt 2 Eingang Herrenstrasse 59302 Oelde / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Schütte, Hartmut, et al BSB Beethovenstrasse 34 59302 Oelde / DE | Application number, filing date | 07022837.4 | 26.11.2007 | [2008/22] | Priority number, date | DE20061056184 | 27.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006056184 | DE20072007617U | 26.05.2007 Original published format: DE 202007007617 U | [2008/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1925408 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1925408 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/26 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
B26D7/26 (EP);
B26D7/265 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, LI, NL [2009/06] |
Former [2008/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Stanzvorrichtung und Gegenstanzzylinder für eine Stanzvorrichtung | [2008/22] | English: | Die cutting device and counter cutting cylinder for a die cutting device | [2008/22] | French: | Dispositif de poinçonnage et cylindre de contre-poinçonnage pour un dispositif de poinçonnage | [2008/22] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 29.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 19.05.2010 | BE | 30.11.2010 | [2011/41] |
Former [2011/19] | NL | 19.05.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4130042 (REED CHARLES F) [A] 1-13 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5083488 (STANLEY MELVIN [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figure 2 *; | [XA]DE10305032 (SPILKER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,13 * paragraph [0027]; figure 4 * [A] 3,6,9-12; | [PXA]DE102005054766 (GS ENGINEERING GMBH [CH]) [PX] 1,2,4,5,7,8,13 * figure 2 * [PA] 3,6,9-12; | [PXA]DE102006016410 (WINKLER & DUENNEBIER AG [DE]) [PX] 1 * the whole document *[PA] 2-13 | by applicant | DE19736762 | DE10305032 | DE102004032030 | DE102004054868 |