EP1941918 - Method for manufacturing an anti-corrosive coating on an implant made from a bio-corrodible magnesium alloy and the implant resulting from the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biotronik VI Patent AG Neuhofstrasse 4 6341 Baar / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states BIOTRONIK VI Patent AG Neuhofstrasse 4 6341 Baar / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kappelt, Gerhard Mühlweg 17a 91080 Uttenreuth / DE | 02 /
Kurze, Peter, Prof., Dr. Lagerstrasse 10 52385 Nideggen / DE | 03 /
Banerjee, Dora Regengasse 10 50171 Kerpen / DE | [2008/28] | Representative(s) | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. Biotronik SE & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. Biotronik GmbH & Co. KG Corporate Intellectual Properties Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2008/28] | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. Biotronik GmbH & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 D-12359 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 07023023.0 | 28.11.2007 | [2008/28] | Priority number, date | DE20061060501 | 19.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006060501 | [2008/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1941918 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1941918 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/02, A61L31/08, A61L31/14, C23C22/68, C25D11/30 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
A61L31/022 (EP,US);
A61L31/082 (EP,US);
A61L31/148 (EP,US);
C23C22/68 (EP,US);
C25D11/026 (EP,US);
C25D11/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/28] | A61L31/02, A61L31/08, A61L31/14 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IE, LI [2011/02] |
Former [2008/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer korrosionshemmenden Beschichtung auf einem Implantat aus einer biokorrodierbaren Magnesiumlegierung sowie nach dem Verfahren hergestelltes Implantat | [2008/28] | English: | Method for manufacturing an anti-corrosive coating on an implant made from a bio-corrodible magnesium alloy and the implant resulting from the method | [2008/28] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un revêtement anticorrosif sur un implant en alliage de magnésium biocorrodable, ainsi qu'implant fabriqué selon ce procédé | [2008/28] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 06.11.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.12.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/48] | 15.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2723952 (EVANGELIDES HARRY A) [X] 1-7 * column 1, lines 21-25,52-56 * * column 3, lines 11-60 * * column 5, lines 34-37 * * examples A,B,C * [I] 11-12; | [XI]US3620939 (FRUCHTNICHT OCKE C) [X] 1-4,6-7 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 26; claims 1-3 * [I] 11-12; | [XI]US4978432 (SCHMELING EDITH L [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8 * example 1 * [I] 11-12; | [XI]DE19913242 (ELECTRO CHEM ENG GMBH [CH]) [X] 1-4,9-10 * page 1, lines 1-11,47-65 * * page 2, lines 14-32; examples 1,3; claims 1-8 * [I] 11-12; | [XI]EP1148154 (OTSUKA KAGAKU KK [JP]) [X] 1,3-4,9-10 * claims 1,6-8,12 * [I] 11-12; | [XI]DE10127770 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0017] - [0022] - [0039]; claims 1,2,6 * [I] 11-12; | [X]DE10357281 (HASSEL THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 13-15* paragraph [0029] *; | [XI]US2006237326 (GER MING-DER [TW], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0008] - [0013] - [0030] * [I] 11-12 | by applicant | DE19731021 | DE10163106 | DE10253634 |