EP1927488 - Vehicle heating device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2021 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 05.01.2022 [2022/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eberspächer Climate Control Systems GmbH Eberspächer Straße 24 73730 Esslingen / DE | [2020/41] |
Former [2013/13] | For all designated states Eberspächer Climate Control Systems GmbH & Co. KG Eberspächer Strasse 24 73730 Esslingen / DE | ||
Former [2008/23] | For all designated states J. Eberspächer GmbH & Co. KG Eberspächerstrasse 24 73730 Esslingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Oliver Neuffenstrasse 36 73207 Plochingen / DE | [2008/23] | Representative(s) | Ruttensperger Lachnit Trossin Gomoll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 20 16 55 80016 München / DE | [2022/01] |
Former [2014/44] | RLTG Ruttensperger Lachnit Trossin Gomoll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 20 16 55 80016 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/23] | Ruttensperger, Bernhard, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07023085.9 | 28.11.2007 | [2008/23] | Priority number, date | DE20061056369 | 29.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006056369 | [2008/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1927488 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1927488 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | [2010/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1927488 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/13] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1927488 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/22, F23L5/02, F23D5/00, F23Q7/06, F24H3/04, F23M5/00 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
F23M5/00 (EP);
F23L5/02 (EP);
F24H3/0429 (EP);
F24H3/0488 (EP);
F23C2900/99009 (EP);
F23D2900/00018 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2010/36] | B60H1/22, F23L5/02, F23D5/00, F23Q7/06 | ||
Former IPC [2008/23] | B60H1/22 | Designated contracting states | CZ, DE, FR, NL, SE [2022/01] |
Former [2011/22] | CZ, DE, FR, NL, SE | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY, DE, FR, NL, SE | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugheizgerät | [2008/23] | English: | Vehicle heating device | [2008/23] | French: | Appareil de chauffage pour véhicule | [2008/23] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 09.03.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.05.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 25.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.2014
07.01.2015
ADMISSIBLE Webasto SE Kraillinger Str. 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE Opponent's representative Ciesla, Dirk Ciesla Patentanwälte Rotmoosweg 7 87629 Füssen - Hopfen / DE | [2015/07] | 04.02.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.03.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.11.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 09.03.2021 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.05.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.05.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 22.11.2021 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 15.12.2016 | Appeal received No. T2692/16 | 02.02.2017 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.05.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 15.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.05.2019 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 01.12.2014 | NL | 01.06.2015 | [2015/51] |
Former [2015/39] | NL | 01.06.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2404841 (HESS FREDERIC O, et al) [A] 8* the whole document *; | [X]DE2432850 (WEBASTO WERK BAIER KG W) [X] 1-3 * page 3, paragraph 2; figure . *; | [X]GB1460220 (BAIER W BAIER W SCHOBER L, et al) [X] 1-3 * page 3, lines 40-62; figure 4 *; | [X]US4623310 (KIMIJIMA YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 7; figure 2 *; | [AP]WO2007104271 (WEBASTO AG [DE], et al) [AP] 7 * figure 1 * | by applicant | DE2432850 | US4623310 |