EP1927521 - Device and method for reducing unpleasant smells in vehicle washing installations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/23] | Device and method for reducing unpleasant smells in vehicle washing installations | ||
[2014/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaw Kiehl KG Rudolf-Diesel-Str. 6 85235 Odelzhausen / DE | [2008/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lenz, Michael Am Kieselhumes 88 66123 Saarbrücken / DE | 02 /
Nett, Peter Grenzstr. 13 86391 Stadtbergen / DE | [2008/23] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [2014/45] |
Former [2008/23] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07023093.3 | 28.11.2007 | [2014/45] | Priority number, date | DE20061056129 | 28.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006056129 | [2008/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1927521 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1927521 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1927521 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/06, B60S3/04, // C02F103/44, C02F1/74 | [2012/34] | CPC: |
B60S3/04 (EP);
C02F3/06 (EP);
C02F1/74 (EP);
C02F2103/44 (EP);
C02F2209/02 (EP);
C02F2209/22 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2008/23] | B60S1/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE [2013/18] |
Former [2008/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | HR | 28.11.2007 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Verminderung von Geruchsbelästigung bei Fahrzeugwaschanlagen | [2014/45] | English: | Device and method for reducing unpleasant smells in vehicle washing installations | [2014/45] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de réduction des nuisances olfactives dans les installations de lavage de véhicules | [2014/45] |
Former [2008/23] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Verminderung von Geruchsbelästigung bei Fahrzeugwaschanlagen | ||
Former [2008/23] | Device and method for reducing unpleasant smells in vehicle washing installations | ||
Former [2008/23] | Dispositif et procédé de réduction des nuisances olfactives dans les installations de lavage de véhicules | Examination procedure | 22.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/14] | 03.04.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   15.05.2012 | 30.11.2012 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   17.05.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE9310027U (BURGER HORST [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,11 * the whole document * [Y] 8; | [XI]EP0694504 (K D MECKLENBURG GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,8,11 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 56; figure 1 * [I] 10; | [Y]DE202005013382U (CARWASH KOHNERT GBR VERTRETUNG [DE]) [Y] 8* paragraph [0021] * | by applicant | DE9310027U | EP0694504 |