EP2065363 - Dental materials based on alkylenediamine-N,N,N',N'-tetraacetic acid-(meth)acrylamides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, BG, CY, HU, MT, NL, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ivoclar Vivadent AG Bendererstrasse 2 9494 Schaan / LI | [2009/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moszner, Norbert, Prof. Dr. Aeulestrasse 23 9495 Triesen / LI | 02 /
Angermann, Jörg, Dr. Calandastrasse 11 7320 Sargans / CH | 03 /
Fischer, Urs Karl Berglistrasse 23 9320 Arbon / CH | 04 /
Rheinberger, Volker, Dr. Mareestrasse 34 9490 Vaduz / LI | [2009/23] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/30] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2009/23] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07023228.5 | 30.11.2007 | [2009/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2065363 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2065363 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07C233/20, A61K6/083, C09J133/26 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
C07C233/20 (EP,US);
A61K6/30 (EP,US);
A61K6/887 (EP,US);
C09J133/26 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/30, C08L33/26 (US,EP);
A61K6/887, C08L33/26 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/30] |
Former [2009/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dentalmaterialien auf der Basis von Alkylendiamin-N,N,N',N'-tetraessigsäure-(meth)acrylamiden | [2009/23] | English: | Dental materials based on alkylenediamine-N,N,N',N'-tetraacetic acid-(meth)acrylamides | [2009/23] | French: | Matériaux dentaires à base d'alkylènediamine-N,N,N',N'-tétraacétique-(méth)acrylamides | [2009/23] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 11.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.11.2007 | BG | 22.07.2015 | CY | 22.07.2015 | CZ | 22.07.2015 | DK | 22.07.2015 | EE | 22.07.2015 | ES | 22.07.2015 | FI | 22.07.2015 | IT | 22.07.2015 | LT | 22.07.2015 | LV | 22.07.2015 | MC | 22.07.2015 | MT | 22.07.2015 | NL | 22.07.2015 | PL | 22.07.2015 | RO | 22.07.2015 | SE | 22.07.2015 | SI | 22.07.2015 | SK | 22.07.2015 | TR | 22.07.2015 | GR | 23.10.2015 | IS | 22.11.2015 | PT | 23.11.2015 | AT | 30.11.2015 | BE | 30.11.2015 | IE | 30.11.2015 | LU | 30.11.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/19] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
AT | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
IE | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
LU | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
LU | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | DK | 22.07.2015 | |
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 22.07.2015 | |
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 22.07.2015 | |
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 22.07.2015 | |
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 22.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5770637 (VANDERLAAN DOUGLAS G [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 10, line 36 - line 38 * * column 5, line 48 - line 50 * [Y] 1-22; | [DY]EP1374828 (IVOCLAR VIVADENT AG [LI]) [DY] 1-22 * examples 1,2 ** paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0013] *; | [Y]EP1721949 (VOCO GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-22 * page 7; figure 5 * * claims 1,6 * | Examination | - Beyer/Walter, Lehrbuch der Organischen Chemie, Stuttgard, S, Hirzel Verlag, (1984), ISBN 3-7776-0406-2 | by applicant | GB1039750 | CS272584 | US2002014138 | WO0213768 | EP1374828 | DE102005022172 | - Y. TOTTI ET AL., DENTAL MATERIALS, (2003), vol. 19, pages 253 - 258 | - N. NISHIYAMA ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (2004), vol. 25, pages 5441 - 5447 | - RÖMPP Lexikon Chemie, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, (1997), page 2221 | - Methoden der Organischen Chemie, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, (1985), vol. E5, page 941 |