EP1930651 - Light source device and vehicle lighting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stanley Electric Co., Ltd. 2-9-13, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | [2008/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ajiki, Shuichi c/o Stanley Electric Co., Ltd. 2-9-13, Nakameguro Meguro-ku, Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | 02 /
Masuyama, Koichi c/o Stanley Electric Co., Ltd. 2-9-13, Nakameguro Meguro-ku, Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | 03 /
Sone, Naoya c/o Stanley Electric Co., Ltd. 2-9-13, Nakameguro Meguro-ku, Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | 04 /
Konishi, Sadayuki c/o Stanley Electric Co., Ltd. 2-9-13, Nakameguro Meguro-ku, Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | 05 /
Toko, Yasuo c/o Stanley Electric Co., Ltd. 2-9-13, Nakameguro Meguro-ku, Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | [2010/10] |
Former [2008/24] | 01 /
Ajiki, Shuichi c/o Stanley Electric Co., Ltd. 2-9-13, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | ||
02 /
Masuyama, Koichi c/o Stanley Electric Co., Ltd. 2-9-13, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | |||
03 /
Sone, Naoya c/o Stanley Electric Co., Ltd. 2-9-13, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | |||
04 /
Konishi, Sadayuki c/o Stanley Electric Co., Ltd. 2-9-13, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | |||
05 /
Toko, Yasuo c/o Stanley Electric Co., Ltd. 2-9-13, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | Representative(s) | Geyer, Ulrich F. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | Geyer, Ulrich F. WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07023593.2 | 05.12.2007 | [2008/24] | Priority number, date | JP20060328147 | 05.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006328147 | [2008/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1930651 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1930651 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/10, // F21Y105/00 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
F21V7/0091 (EP,US);
F21S41/24 (EP,US);
F21S8/00 (EP,US);
G02B6/0043 (EP,US);
F21V2200/20 (EP,US);
F21Y2105/00 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/08] |
Former [2008/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lichtquellenvorrichtung und Fahrzeugbeleuchtungsvorrichtung | [2008/24] | English: | Light source device and vehicle lighting device | [2008/24] | French: | Dispositif source de lumière et dispositif d'éclairage de véhicule | [2008/24] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/04] | 12.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0532262 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 5,8 * figure 8 *; | [X]JPH06300922 (OHTSU TIRE & RUBBER CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]US5477422 (HOOKER GUY [GB], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 36 - line 60 * * figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP0838628 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [A] 8 * figure 1 *; | [X]US6275339 (CHAZALLET FREDERIC [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * figures 1-7 *; | [A]US2001019486 (THOMINET VINCENT [CH]) [A] 9 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO02066893 (WYTEC HOLDING B V [NL], et al) [X] 1,4-7 * figures 8,21,23 *; | [X]JP2003329977 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,2,8,11 * abstract *; | [X]JP2004247072 (FUNAI ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]EP1487025 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 8 * paragraph [0014] * * figures 3-8 *; | [A]EP1515368 (NICHIA CORP [JP]) [A] 5 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraphs [0032] , [0033] ** figures 1C,1D * | by applicant | JPH06300922 | US5477422 | WO0101037 | JP2001076510 | US6275339 | WO02066893 | JP2003329977 | JP2004247072 | US2006022211 | JP2006048934 |