EP1908512 - Process for producing inorganic spheres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited Shin-Marunouchi Building 1-5-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2011/43] |
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsubara, Toshiya c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 10, Goikaigan, Ichihara-shi Chiba / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Masaharu c/o AGC Si-Tech CO., LTD. 13-1, Kitaminato-machi Wakamatsu-ku, Kitakyusyu-shi, Fukuoka / JP | 03 /
Tatematsu, Shin c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Yamada, Kazuhiko c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 05 /
Yamada, Kenji c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 06 /
Ebata, Kenichi c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 07 /
Katayama, Hajime c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 10, Goikaigan, Ichihara-shi Chiba / JP | 08 /
Tsunozaki, Kentarou c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | [2008/24] |
Former [2008/20] | 01 /
Matsubara, Toshiya c/o Toshiya Asahi Glass Company, Limited 10, Goikaiga, Ichihara-shi Chiba / JP | ||
02 /
Masaharu, Tanaka c/o AGC SI-Tech CO., LTD. 13-1, Kitaminato-machi Wakamatsu-ku, Kitakyusyu-shi, Fukuoka / JP | |||
03 /
Tatematsu, Shin c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | |||
04 /
Yamada, Kazuhiko c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | |||
05 /
Yamada, Kenji c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | |||
06 /
Ebata, Kenichi c/o Asahi Glass Company, LimitedC 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Cgiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | |||
07 /
Katayama, Hajime c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 10, Goikaigan, Ichihara-shi Chiba / JP | |||
08 /
Tsunozaki, Kentarou c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | |||
Former [2008/15] | 01 /
Matsubara, Toshiya c/o Toshiya Asahi Glass Company, Limited 10, Goikaiga, Ichihara-shi Chiba / JP | ||
02 /
Masaharu, Tanaka 8-14-708, Nakahonmachi Tobata-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka / JP | |||
03 /
Tatematsu, Shin c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | |||
04 /
Yamada, Kazuhiko c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | |||
05 /
Yamada, Kenji c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | |||
06 /
Ebata, Kenichi 2-7-15-B-201, Tokurikishinmachi Kokuraminami-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka / JP | |||
07 /
Katayama, Hajime c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 10, Goikaigan, Ichihara-shi Chiba / JP | |||
08 /
Tsunozaki, Kentarou c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07023692.2 | 11.07.2003 | [2008/15] | Priority number, date | JP20020205609 | 15.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002205609 | JP20030069832 | 14.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003069832 | JP20030095526 | 31.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003095526 | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1908512 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/04 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
C01B33/124 (EP,US);
B01F23/4105 (EP,US);
B01F25/3142 (EP,US);
B01J13/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2008/15] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für anorganische Kugeln | [2008/15] | English: | Process for producing inorganic spheres | [2008/15] | French: | Procédé de production de sphères inorganiques | [2008/15] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 10.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/16] | 26.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/16] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03015573.3 / EP1382384 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030015573) is 28.04.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4201691 (ASHER WILLIAM J [US], et al) [A] 1,19* example 1 *; | [A]US6155710 (NAKAJIMA MITSUTOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 2,19 * example 2 *; | [XD]US2002043731 (NAKAJIMA MITSUTOSHI [JP], et al) [XD] 1-3,7 * claims 1,5 * | by applicant | JPS5755454B | JPH0261407B | US5376347 | US2002043731 | JP2002205609 | JP2003069832 | JP2003095526 |