EP2009162 - Process for preparing an elastic nonwoven web [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phoenix Intellectuals and Technologies Management, Inc. 6, Lane 213, Sec. 1, Hai-Den Road Tainan 709 / TW | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | For all designated states Phoenix Intellectuals and Technologies Management, Inc. 6, Lane 213, Sec. 1, Hai-Den Road Tainan 709 / TW | ||
For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsai, De-Sheng 1080 W. Main Street Apt. 1218 Hendersonville TN 37075 / US | 02 /
Tsai, Te-Hsin 6, Lane 213 Sec 1 Hai-Den Road Tainan 709 / TW | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/01] | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz, Patentanwälte, Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07023697.1 | 05.12.2003 | [2009/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2009162 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2009162 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/54, D04H3/16, D04H5/04, D04H13/00, D06C3/00 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
D06C3/00 (EP,US);
D04H1/54 (EP,US);
D04H1/544 (EP,US);
D04H13/00 (EP,US);
D04H3/007 (EP,US);
D04H3/16 (EP,US);
D04H5/04 (EP,US);
D04H5/06 (EP,US);
Y10T442/60 (EP,US);
Y10T442/601 (EP,US);
Y10T442/602 (EP,US);
Y10T442/637 (EP,US);
Y10T442/659 (EP,US);
Y10T442/66 (EP,US);
Y10T442/674 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines elastischen Vliesnetzes | [2009/01] | English: | Process for preparing an elastic nonwoven web | [2009/01] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un voile non tissé élastique | [2009/01] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2007 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 06.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/15] | 23.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/15] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03028126.5 / EP1538250 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   07.06.2010 | 31.12.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US5244482 (HASSENBOEHLER JR CHARLES B [US], et al) [XD] 1 * column 4, lines 28-56 - column 9, lines 43-60; claims 1,16 *; | [A]WO9503114 (UNIV TENNESSEE RES CORP [US]) [A] 1-13* page 8, line 23 - page 10, line 34 *; | [X]US5599366 (HASSENBOEHLER JR CHARLES B [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 8, line 25 - column 10, line 29 *; | [A]EP0844323 (FLEXUS SPECIALTY NONWOVENS L T [TW]) [A] 1-13 * page 3, lines 10-30; claims 1,14 *; | [A]US2003003833 (KURIHARA KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0047] - [0050] *; | [A]US2003022582 (CREE JAMES W [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0027] - [0030] * | by applicant | US3338992 | US3341394 | US3502763 | US3502538 | US3542615 | US3692618 | US3772417 | US3795571 | US3802817 | US3811957 | US3949127 | US3978185 | US4048364 | US4223059 | US4276336 | US4340563 | US4443513 | US5169706 | US5244482 | US5296289 | EP0844323 | EP0882147 | - WENDT, INDUSTRIAL AND ENGINEERING CHEMISTRY, (1965), vol. 48, no. 8, page 1342 |