EP1892227 - Process for producing a boron carbide based sintered body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/09] | Boron carbide based sintered body and process for its production | ||
[2012/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | For all designated states DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 4-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8455 / JP | [2008/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirao, Kiyoshi National Institute of AIST AIST Chubu, 2266-98 Aza Anagahora Oaza Shimoshidami Moriyama-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 463-8560 / JP | 02 /
Sakaguchi, Shuji National Institute of AIST AIST Chubu, 2266-98 Aza Anagahora Oaza Shimoshidami Moriyama-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 463-8560 / JP | 03 /
Yamauchi, Yukihiko National Institute of AIST AIST Chubu, 2266-98 Aza Anagahora Oaza Shimoshidami Moriyama-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 463-8560 / JP | 04 /
Kanzaki, Shuzo National Institute of AIST AIST Chubu, 2266-98 Aza Anagahora Oaza Shimoshidami Moriyama-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 463-8560 / JP | 05 /
Yamada, Suzuya, Denki Kagaku Kogyo K.K. Nihonbashi Mitsui Tower 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8338 / JP | [2012/51] |
Former [2008/27] | 01 /
Hirao, Kiyoshi National Institute of AIST AIST Chubu, 2266-98 Aza Anagahora Oaza Shimoshidami Moriyama-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 463-8560 / JP | ||
02 /
Sakaguchi, Shuji National Institute of AIST AIST Chubu, 2266-98 Aza Anagahora Oaza Shimoshidami Moriyama-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 463-8560 / JP | |||
03 /
Yamauchi, Yukihiko National Institute of AIST AIST Chubu, 2266-98 Aza Anagahora Oaza Shimoshidami Moriyama-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 463-8560 / JP | |||
04 /
Kanzaki, Shuzo National Institute of AIST AIST Chubu, 2266-98 Aza Anagahora Oaza Shimoshidami Moriyama-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 463-8560 / JP | |||
05 /
Yamada, Suzuya, Denki Kagaku Kogyo K.K. Nihonbashi Mitsui Tower, 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8338 / JP | |||
Former [2008/11] | 01 /
Hirao, Kiyoshi National Institute of AIST AIST Chubu, 2266-98 Aza Anagahora Oaza Shimoshidami Moriyama-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 463-8560 / JP | ||
02 /
Sakaguchi, Shuji National Institute of AIST AIST Chubu, 2266-98 Aza Anagahora Oaza Shimoshidami Moriyama-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 463-8560 / JP | |||
03 /
Yamauchi, Yukihiko National Institute of AIST AIST Chubu, 2266-98 Aza Anagahora Oaza Shimoshidami Moriyama-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 463-8560 / JP | |||
04 /
Kanzaki, Shuzo National Institute of AIST AIST Chubu, 2266-98 Aza Anagahora Oaza Shimoshidami Moriyama-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 463-8560 / JP | |||
05 /
Yamada, Suzuya Shidami Human Science Park Sentan Gijyutsu Renkei Research Center 2268-1, Aza Anagahora, Oaza Shimoshidami Moriyama-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi 463-8687 / JP | |||
Former [2008/09] | 01 /
Hirao, Kiyoshi National Institute of AIST AIST Chubu, 2266-98 Aza Anagahora Oaza Shimoshidami Moriyama-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 463-8560 / JP | ||
02 /
Sakaguchi, Shuji National Institute of AIST AIST Chubu, 2266-98 Aza Anagahora Oaza Shimoshidami Moriyama-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 463-8560 / JP | |||
03 /
Yamauchi, Y. National Institute of AIST AIST Chubu, 2266-98 Aza Anagahora Oaza Shimoshidami Moriyama-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 463-8560 / JP | |||
04 /
Kanzaki, Shuzo National Institute of AIST AIST Chubu, 2266-98 Aza Anagahora Oaza Shimoshidami Moriyama-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 463-8560 / JP | |||
05 /
Yamada, Suzuya Shidami Human Science Park Sentan Gijyutsu Renkei Research Center 2268-1, Aza Anagahora, Oaza Shimoshidami Moriyama-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi 463-8687 / JP | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/51] | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/39] | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/09] | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershauser & Hartz Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07023698.9 | 06.11.2002 | [2008/09] | Priority number, date | JP20010341205 | 06.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001341205 | JP20020131272 | 07.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002131272 | [2008/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1892227 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1892227 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/56, B23B27/14 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
C04B35/645 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C04B35/563 (EP,US);
C04B35/64 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3231 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3232 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3813 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3821 (EP,US);
C04B2235/422 (EP,US);
C04B2235/424 (EP,US);
C04B2235/528 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5409 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5445 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5454 (EP,US);
C04B2235/604 (EP,US);
C04B2235/656 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6562 (EP,US);
C04B2235/658 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6581 (EP,US);
C04B2235/661 (EP,US);
C04B2235/77 (EP,US);
C04B2235/786 (EP,US);
C04B2235/80 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung gesinterter Keramikkörper auf der Basis von Borkarbid | [2012/24] | English: | Process for producing a boron carbide based sintered body | [2012/21] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un corps fritté à base de carbure de bore | [2012/21] |
Former [2008/09] | Borkabid-basierter Sinterkörper und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | ||
Former [2008/09] | Boron carbide based sintered body and process for its production | ||
Former [2008/09] | Corps fritté à base de carbure de bore et son procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 06.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 08.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02780026.7 / EP1452509 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020780026) is 24.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX] - YAMADA ET AL, "MICROSTRUCTURE AND MECHANICAL PROPERTIES OF B4C-CRB2 CERAMICS", KEY ENGINEERING MATERIALS, TRANS TECH PUBLICATIONS LTD., STAFA-ZURICH, CH, (20020215), vol. 206-213, ISSN 1013-9826, pages 811 - 814, XP009079304 [PX] 1-7 * Experimental; Results and Discussion, figures 3(b) & (c), Table 1 * | [PA] - YAMADA SUZUYA ET AL, "MECHANICAL PROPERTIES OF BORON CARBIDE CERAMICS", CERAMIC ENGINEERING AND SCIENCE PROCEEDINGS, COLUMBUS, US, (2001), ISSN 0196-6219, pages 215 - 220, XP009079326 [PA] 1-7 * the whole document * | [PA] - FRAGE ET AL, "THE EFFECT OF CR2O3 AND CRB2 ADDITIONS ON THE PRESSURELESS SINTERING OF B4C PREFORMS", SCIENCE OF SINTERING, YUGOSLAV ASSOCIATION FOR ETAN, BEOGRAD, YU, (2001), vol. 33, no. 3, ISSN 0350-820X, pages 149 - 158, XP009079303 [PA] 1-7 * the whole document * | by applicant | - YAMADA ET AL., CERAMIC ENGINEERING AND SCIENCE PROCEEDINGS, (2001), pages 215 - 220 | - FRAGE ET AL., SCIENCE OF SINTERING, (2001), vol. 33, pages 149 - 158 |