EP2070590 - Supporting system of heat-exchange plates in isothermal chemical reactors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.2010 [2010/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METHANOL CASALE S.A. Via Giulio Pocobelli, 6 6900 Lugano-Besso / CH | [2009/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rizzi, Enrico Via Manzoni 4 22070 Casnate con Bernate (CO) / IT | 02 /
Filippi, Ermanno Strada di Gandria 76 6976 Castagnola / CH | 03 /
Tarozzo, Mirco Via Piffaretti 6853 Ligornetto / CH | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Zardi, Marco, et al M. Zardi & Co. SA Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | Zardi, Marco, et al M. Zardi & Co. S.A. Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 07023925.6 | 11.12.2007 | [2009/25] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2070590 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/02, F28D9/00 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
B01J8/0285 (EP,US);
B01J19/249 (EP,US);
B01J8/0214 (EP,US);
F28D9/0018 (EP,US);
B01J2208/0015 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00024 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2455 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2458 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2462 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2481 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2485 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2492 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/08] |
Former [2009/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System zur Unterstützung von Wärmetauschplatten in isothermischen chemischen Reaktoren | [2009/25] | English: | Supporting system of heat-exchange plates in isothermal chemical reactors | [2009/25] | French: | Système de support de plaques d'échanges thermiques dans des réacteurs chimiques isothermes | [2009/25] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/27] | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10031347 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] * the whole document *; | [X]EP1221339 (METHANOL CASALE SA [CH]) [X] 1,3,6,11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1300190 (METHANOL CASALE SA [CH]) [A] * paragraph [0025]; figures 1,5 *; | [A]WO03035241 (METHANOL CASALE SA [CH], et al) [A] * figure 1 *; | [A]EP1757360 (METHANOL CASALE SA [CH]) [A] * paragraphs [0001] , [0041] , [0054] , [0060] , [0061]; figures 4-6 * | by applicant | EP1284813 |