EP1932988 - Door lock of cargo container having burglarproof function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.J. Korea Co., Ltd. 1515-3 Dadae-dong Saha-gu Busan / KR | [2008/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeong, Kum-Sik 106-613, Hyupsung-Phoenix Town, no.560-14, Buam-dong, Busanijn-gu Busan / KR | [2008/25] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07024019.7 | 11.12.2007 | [2008/25] | Priority number, date | KR20060126626 | 12.12.2006 Original published format: KR 20060126626 | [2008/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1932988 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/25] | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/16 | [2008/25] | CPC: |
E05B77/44 (EP);
E05B83/10 (EP);
E05B13/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Türverriegelung eines Frachtcontainers mit Anti-Diebstahlfunktion | [2008/25] | English: | Door lock of cargo container having burglarproof function | [2008/25] | French: | Verrou de porte d'un conteneur de marchandises ayant une fonction anti-effraction | [2008/25] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 19.10.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | KR100425540B | WO2004014764 |